Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/25/2019 at 03:29:23 (UTC).

ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., VS. JOHN GILSON et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN GILSON. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8465

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

GILSON, ALANNA

GILSON, JOHN

DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SILVA BERNARDO M

SILVA, BERNARDO MARIO

Suite 1800, Two Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN GILSON, ALANNA DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:370.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GILSON, ALANNA

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF : REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; PROPOSED JUDGMENT; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT,CLERK'S JUDGMENT, WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, INTEREST AND COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED APR-13-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN GILSON, ALANNA

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN GILSON, ALANNA

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT, WAIVER OF ATTORNEY'S FEE INTEREST AND COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN GILSON, ALANNA $10,368.00 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,368.00, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-07-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-07-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2013
  • Payment : COMPLAINT/PETITION/FIRST PAPER; Amount : $370; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1213204F010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-07-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-07-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN GILSON, ALANNA $10,368.00 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,368.00, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • DECLARATION RE: ORIGINAL AGREEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT, WAIVER OF ATTORNEY'S FEE INTEREST AND COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN GILSON, ALANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF : REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; PROPOSED JUDGMENT; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT,CLERK'S JUDGMENT, WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, INTEREST AND COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED APR-13-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN GILSON, ALANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN GILSON, ALANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GILSON, ALANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELINA'S SCHOOLS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT GILSON, JOHN GILSON, ALANNA DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:$370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVS, BERNARDO M