This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 01:27:05 (UTC).

ANDREW ROWEN et al VS. AEROFDC LP et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2012 ANDREW ROWEN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against AEROFDC LP. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7234

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL

KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL

SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VERNA, MICHAEL PATRICK

Attorney at BOWLES & VERNA LLP

2121 N. California Blvd, Ste 875

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorney

CAMPBELL, DALE C

Attorney at WEINTRAUB GENSHLEA & SPROUL

400 Capitol Mall 11Th Fl

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED DEC-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED DEC-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

ORDER

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY LITIGATION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-20-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-19-2014 CONTINUED TO JUN-18-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COMPLAINT

FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-22-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-19-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-07-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED DEC-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED DEC-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERTO STAY DISCOVERY FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR FEB-19-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:2700.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-22-2013 CONTINUED TO NOV-20-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-17-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-18-2014 CONTINUED TO SEP-17-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-13-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANTS AEROFDC LP, AEROMETALS, LLC, REX KAMPHEFNER, GUY ICENOGLE, LORIE SYMON'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD IS OFF CALENDAR PER MOVING PARTY. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, NOT REPORTED. (302)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • POS RE: REPLY TO OPPOS. TO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND REQ. FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DECLARATION OF DALE C CAMPBELL REPLY TO OPPOS. OF PLTF'S TO PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERTO STAY DISCOVERY FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR FEB-19-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:2700.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED DEC-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED DEC-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED DEC-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED DEC-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED DEC-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED DEC-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWEN, ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FDC MERGER COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILTRATION DEVELOPMENT WASHINGTON, LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORBITAL ASSET HOLDINGS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT AEROFDC LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AEROMETALS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AEROMETALS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KAMPHEFNER, REX AN INDIVIDUAL ICENOGLE, GUY AN INDIVIDUAL SYMON, LORIE AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-22-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-19-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-07-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less