This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 15:30:13 (UTC).

ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, et al VS. REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2012 ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0720

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD L

LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY

ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 15, INCLUSIVE

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NEVIN EDWARD J

MITCHELL, JEFFREY S

Attorney at MITCHELL LAW GROUP

2001 Union Street, Suite 397

San Francisco, CA 94123

NEVIN, EDWARD JOSEPH

396 Windmill Land

Petaluma, CA 94954

Defendant Attorneys

LUCCHESE, DAVID ROSS

Attorney at GALLOWAY, LUCCHESE, EVERSON & PICCHI

2300 Contra Costa Blvd, Ste 350

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523-2398

LYNCH, ROBERT THOMAS

Attorney at LYNCH, GILARDI & GRUMMER

170 Columbus Avenue, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

 

Court Documents

Defendant Van Vincent Halbach MDs Notice of Motion and Motion for Summ

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57309409) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D. HEARING SET FOR AUG-13-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:500.00)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Van Vince

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57309409) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendan

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57309409) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

Declaration of Gary Duckwiler MD in Support of Defendants Motion for S

DECLARATION OF GARY DUCKWILER MD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57309409) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

Declaration of Frances Burns in Support of Defendants Motion for Summa

DECLARATION OF FRANCES BURNS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57309409) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILE

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH, M.D. (TRANSACTION ID # 100002162) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE ON NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFT VAN VINCENT HALBACH, M.D. (TRANSACTION ID # 100002162) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY

Defendant Van Vincent Halbach, MDs Reply to Plaintiffs Notice of Non-O

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57675405) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

COMPLAINT

MALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY AS TO DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA DOES 1 TO 15, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-10-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-09-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-25-2012 (Fee:410.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS

ORDER

ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY SERVED APR-14-2014, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

Stipulation Regarding Authenticity of Medical Records

STIPULATION REGARDING AUTHENTICITY OF MEDICAL RECORDS (TRANSACTION ID # 57309409) FILED BY VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57309409) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

Defendant Regents of the University of Californias Notice of Motion an

DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIAS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 57472655) FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA HEARING SET FOR JUL-30-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:EXEMPT)

Defendant Van Vincent Halbach, M.D.s Notice of Entry of Judgment or Or

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 57718745) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58294799) FILED BY ATTORNEY MITCHELL, JEFFREY S

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58294799) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58294799) FILED BY ATTORNEY MITCHELL, JEFFREY S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 57996285) FILED BY ATTORNEY LUCCHESE, DAVID ROSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 57718745) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER: MELANIE GHENO, CSR # 7489

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-13-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 57703064) FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57675405) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN VINCENT HALBACH M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-14-2015 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON JUN-20-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY SERVED JAN-10-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-12-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JAN-09-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-10-2012 CONTINUED TO JAN-09-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY (Fee:300.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (ERNESTO VASQUEZ APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • FEE PAID ON APPLICAITON AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ; A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM LARA, ROSALINDA INDIVIDUALLY AS TO DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA DOES 1 TO 15, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-10-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-09-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-25-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Jeffrey S. Mitchell, SBN: 188751 Rebecca L. Byrne, SBN: 139893

MITCHELL LAW GROUP

473 Jackson Street, 3™ Floor F I San Francisco, CA 94111 San Frangh L E sco Up’f/Of urnt

Tel: (415) 692-7540 County Fax: (415) 276-9099 MAR 28 5,

- SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA - COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ, a minor, by and | Case No.: GCG-12-520720 through, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, his Guardian ad Litem; ROSALINDA LARA, individually,

Plaintiffs, [Proposed]

Vs, ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TO COMPLAINT

CALIFORNIA and DOES 1 through 15, inclusive,

Complaint filed: May 10, 2012

Defendants.

IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs be allowed to file the attached Amendment to

MAR 2 8 2014 ' /|

Judge of the Superior ERNEST H. DSMITH

Judge of the Superior ERNEST H. DSMITH S wWN

S wWN

\O o0 ~ AN W

Jeffrey S. Mitchell, SBN: 188751

MITCHELL LAW GROUP

473 Jackson Street, 3™ Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Tel: (415) 692-7540

Edward J. Nevin, SBN 41226

LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD J. NEVIN 396 Windmill Lane

Petaluma, CA 94954

Telephone: (707) 766-9556

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

ANDREW LARA VASQUEZ, a minor, by and | Case No.: GCG-12-520720 through, ERNESTO VASQUEZ, his Guardian

ad Litem; ROSALINDA LARA, individually,

CCP §474 AMENDMENT TO

Plaintiffs, COMPLAINT vs.

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF

CALIFORNIA and DOES 1 through 15, inclusive,

Defendants.

Plaintiffs, upon discovering the true name of Defendant served herein as Doe One, amend their complaint by substituting the name, Van Vincent Halbach, M.D., as a defendant

in placeparagraph in which Doe One is included in the Complaint.

Dated: \ -4 -13 MITCHELLL LAW GROUP

By: < L. . Rebecca L. Byrne Attorney for Plaintiffs