Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:50:53 (UTC).

ANDRES MURGUIA VS. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 ANDRES MURGUIA filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8490

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURGUIA, ANDRES

Defendants

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 15

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERLEY, J EDWARD

1939 Harrison St. Ste. 500

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorneys

MELLEMA CYNTHIA L

MELLEMA, CYNTHIA LOUISE

Attorney at DENTON US LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

QUAN, HEIDI C

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING, LLP

275 Battery St Ste 550

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER DENYING ANDRES MURGUIA'S MOTION TO COMPEL ALLSTATE TO FURTHER RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 8.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES

COMPLAINT

BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES AS TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 15 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Order Rescheduling Hearing

THE AUG-14-2013 OBJECTION HEARING IS RESCHEDULED TO AUG-21-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 8.0 DAYS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION (Fee:450.00)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-06-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:450.00)

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES AS TO DEFENDANT THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES SERVED FEB-16-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-30-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUG-14-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF QUAN, HEIDI C ON MAY-01-2014 THROUGH MAY-31-2014 FILED BY DEFENDANT THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2014
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-06-2014 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED 7/2/14. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • CASE NOT ASSIGNED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • MSC SETTING REVIEW CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF QUAN, HEIDI C ON MAY-01-2014 THROUGH MAY-31-2014 FILED BY DEFENDANT THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-13-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-14-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC.. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 8.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY MELLEMA, CYNTHIA LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES SERVED FEB-16-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES SERVED FEB-08-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURGUIA, ANDRES AS TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION THE RESTORATION CLEANUP CO., INC. A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 15 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less