This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 11:14:24 (UTC).

ANA EDITH CONTRERAS et al VS. D'ANDRE WHITE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2014 ANA EDITH CONTRERAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against D'ANDRE WHITE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, JOHN K. STEWART, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II, CYNTHIA M. LEE and RONALD E. QUIDACHAY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6869

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

JOHN K. STEWART

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

CYNTHIA M. LEE

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH

CONTRERAS, ANA ELIZABETH

PARHAM, TERESA J.

WHITE, D ANDRE AN INDIVIDUAL (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-14-537088)

HARRIS, CARL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL.

WHITE, D'ANDRE

HARRIS, JAMAL

CONTRERAS, ANNA E AN INDIVIDUAL (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-14-537088)

CONTRERAS,, ANA EDITH (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-14-537088)

CONTRERAS, EDITH AN INDIVIDUAL (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-14-537088)

AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-14-537088)

HARRIS, CARL

PARHAM, TERESA AN INDIVIDUAL (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-14-537088)

CONTRERAS, ANA ELEIZABETH (NAMED HEREIN AS "ANNA E. CONTRERAS--DEFT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE CGC-14-537088)

PARHAM, TERESA J. (DEFT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE CGC-14-537088)

HARRIS, CARL AS THE TESTATE AND/OR INTESTATE SUCCESSOR OF ALICE J. WHITE, BELIEVED TO BE DECEASED, WHO CLIAMS BY, THROUGH AND UNDER ALICE J. WHITE

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HARRIS, JAMAL

ROES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

WHITE, D ANDRE AN INDIVIDUAL (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-14-537088)

HARRIS, CARL

MOES 1 TO 10

MOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

Other

OLD REPUBLIC TITLE COMPANY

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY HOWARD

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

One California Street, 3Rd Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94111

MLNARIK, JOHN L

Attorney at THE MLNARIK LAW GROUP, INC.

2930 Bowers Ave

Santa Clara, CA 95051

CAVIN, JOHN FREDERICK

Attorney at HOGE, FENTON, JONES & APPEL, INC

4309 Hacienda Drive, Suite 350

Pleasanton, CA 94588

ALVAREZ, CARLOS A

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS & WALKER LLP

1 California St., Suite 300, 3Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorney

LEE, WILLIAM

Attorney at OLD REPUBLIC TITLE COMPANY

275 Battery St., 15Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57120755) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH CONTRERAS, ANA ELIZABETH PARHAM, TERESA J. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15005097) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT HARRIS, CARL

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED PER ORDER BY CROSS COMPLAINANT WHITE, D ANDRE AN INDIVIDUAL (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-14-537088) AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT HARRIS, JAMAL HARRIS, CARL ROES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE OBJECTION ASSIGNMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE

OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE OBJECTION ASSIGNMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 57163261) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH CONTRERAS, ANA ELIZABETH PARHAM, TERESA J.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56758917) FILED BY DEFENDANT WHITE, D'ANDRE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS BY FED EX RE PLTFS' OPPOS TO WHITE'S MTN TO COMPEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH CONTRERAS, ANA ELIZABETH PARHAM, TERESA J.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO MTN TO CONSOLIDATE; POS FILED BY DEFENDANT WHITE, D'ANDRE

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION; SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WHITE, D'ANDRE

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT WHITE, D'ANDRE

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R8315730F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketPayment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4715512C010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : R7815504M014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R7815504M013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W6614C18M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W6614C18M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketPayment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : B4714B24J007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • DocketPayment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : W1614B21C016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1614B21M015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1614B12F024

    Read MoreRead Less
170 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketJURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketMOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH HEARING SET FOR MAR-27-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE: CGC-14-537088 FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH CONTRERAS, ANA ELIZABETH PARHAM, TERESA J. SERVED FEB-05-2014, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WHITE, D'ANDRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketQUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRERAS, ANA EDITH CONTRERAS, ANA ELIZABETH PARHAM, TERESA J. AS TO DEFENDANT WHITE, D'ANDRE DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-25-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-24-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-02-2014 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

i THE MLNARIK LAW GROUP, INC. t JOHN L. MLNARIK (SBN 257882) JIM ERICK.SON (SBN 235630)

Irmimae

| “JAMES” HUAN LY (SBN 289912) ENDORSED

NINA C. DECKER (SBN 284983) S sod CouniBiuin, CH%RLES R. HELLSTROM (SBN 294540) ¥ mhserior Court 1 2930 Bowers Avenue ‘ | Santa Clara, CA 95051 MAR 1 ¢ 2015 1 Telephone: (408) 919-0088 o | Facsimile: (408) 919-0188 o e COURT

wfl@g}utywéé&m

| Attorneys for D’ ANDRE WHITE

SUPERICR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

ANA EDITH CONTRERAS, an individual; } Consolidated Case No.: CGC-14-536869 | ANA ELIZABETH CONTRERAS, an individual; and TERESA J. PARHAM, an individual,

i =3 O Wt b W N

ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO CARL o HARRIS? CROSS-COMPLAINT

Plaintiff(s}, V.

D’ ANDRE WHITE, an individual, and DOES 1 to 10, Inclusive,

Defendant(s).

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTIONS FILED BY D’ANDRE WHITE

i AND RELATED CROSS-ACTIONS FILED BY t CARL HARRIS

i‘Snceet” Mgy st Mg Smnsos Mozt Noniint® Mt Sorsinst? Nt Mot Sempeet Nt e’

Cross- Defendant I’ Andre White’s Demurrer to Cross- Complaint was set for hearing on February 20, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. in Department 501 of the San Francisco Ce}mfij} ‘Superior Court, before the Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. A tentative ruling was posted by the Court during the

| afternoon of Pebruary 19, 2015, neither party alerted the court of an intention to contest the tentative ruling. Therefore, the tentative ruling will, and hereby is adopted as the Order of Court. Demurrer to cross complaint is SUSTAINED in part and OVERRULED in part. Demurrer is

sustained with leave to amend to allege facts (not conclusions) in support of each element of the

sustained with leave to amend to allege facts (not conclusions) in support of each element of the elder abuse cause of action. Demurrer is otherwise overruled. Carl Harris has standing. In re Estate

elder abuse cause of action. Demurrer is otherwise overruled. Carl Harris has standing. In re Estate

of Lowrie (2004) 118 cal.app.4th 220,

ITIS SO ORDERED.

can, Sl B f G BRSPS%Wfiézyr:%;?%%&gwéé Ezfl ::’\%%E%%Egg% {{Li %/M;%;f%% [

DATED: o Judge of the Superior Court

RONALD E. OUIDACHAY

Approved as conforming to orders of Court.

patEp 2722/ 1 S

Steven J. Kahn HOGE, FENTON, JONES & APPEL, INC. Attorneys for Cross-Complainant Carl Harris

e e e an akanVSRS FVRESRVERERRC T W VR SRR RERVIRRE AR R R EERSVERRRERRE AR AT IRECC OV SREEEEETTIITREY N STV VTPVreréATTAAAArrrrbvFastrrrifruacehacres.

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6869
Case Title:ANA EDITH CONTRERAS et al VS. D'ANDRE WHITE
Court Date:JUL-21-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike Carl Harris' First Amended Cross-Complaint
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, July 21, 2015, Line 1:CROSS DEFENDANT D'ANDRE WHITE'S Motion To Strike Carl Harris' First Amended Cross-Complaint.Moot. =(501/AJR)


Case Number:*******6869
Case Title:ANA EDITH CONTRERAS et al VS. D'ANDRE WHITE
Court Date:JUL-01-2014 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Hearing Of Plaintiff D Andre White'S Motion To Compel Production Of Business Records By Non-Party Old Republic Title Company, For Monetary Sanctions, And For Attorney'S Fees & Costs
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, July 1, 2014, Line 5, Hearing Of Plaintiff D Andre White'S Motion To Compel Production Of Business Records By Non-Party Old Republic Title Company, For Monetary Sanctions, And For Attorney'S Fees & CostsPro Tem Judge Peter Catalanotti, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge.The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Appearance Required. The Motion to Compel and Motion to Quash pertain to the same April 18, 2014 Subpoena to Old Republic Title Company ("ORTC"). The Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part. The Motion to Quash is GRANTED in part. Counsel is to meet and confer before the hearing as to what specific "personal identifying information" and "private financial information" should be redacted by ORTC before the documents are produced. ORTC shall produce all redacted documents that are responsive to the subpoena within 10 days of service of this order. All requests for sanctions are DENIED. =302/jpt


Case Number:*******6869
Case Title:ANA EDITH CONTRERAS et al VS. D'ANDRE WHITE
Court Date:JUN-18-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Quash And/ Or To Impose Conditions On White'S Deposition Subpoenas Seeking Consumer Records From Old Republic Title Company Including Request For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, June 18, 2014 line 5. PLAINTIFFs ANA CONTRERAS, ANA CONTRERAS, TERESA PARHAM's Motion To Quash And/ Or To Impose Conditions On White'S Deposition Subpoenas Seeking Consumer Records From Old Republic Title Company Including Request For Monetary Sanctionscontinued to July 1, 2014 to be heard in department 302 at 9:00 a.m.= (501/REQ)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John L. Mlnarik

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAVIN ESQ, JOHN F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY A.