Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/05/2016 at 06:32:45 (UTC).

ANA ALICIA LEON VS. SUKHI SANDER et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2009 ANA ALICIA LEON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SUKHI SANDER. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4152

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

LEON, ANA ALICIA

Defendants and Respondents

SANDER, SUKHI AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94114

SANDER BROTHERS ENTERPRISES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOMBAY INDIAN RESTAURANT

2217 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94114

SINGH, JUJAAR AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

URIARTE, ARLO GARCIA

Attorney at LIBERATION LAW GROUP, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DIDALEUSKY, C. MATTHEW

Attorney at CMD ASSOCIATES

One Kaiser Plaza, Ste 470

Oakland, CA 94612

Other Attorneys

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS

455 Golden Gate Ave 10Th Flr.E

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

Notice of Time and Place of Trial (Labor Appeal)

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE MAILED (LABOR APPEAL) COURT TRIAL SET FOR FEB-01-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

MINUTES FOR FEB-01-2010 10:50 AM

MINUTES FOR FEB-01-2010 10:50 AM

MINUTES FOR FEB-02-2010 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR FEB-02-2010 9:00 AM

EXHIBIT LIST

EXHIBIT LIST FILED

WITNESS LIST

WITNESS LIST FILED

ORDER

ORDER ORDER & STIPULATION TO RETURN ALL TRIAL EXHIBITS & DEPOSITIONS TO RESPECTIVE COUNSEL FOR SAFE-KEEPING

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT DEFENDANT SANDER, SUKHI AN INDIVIDUAL SANDER BROTHERS ENTERPRISES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOMBAY INDIAN RESTAURANT SINGH, JUJAAR AN INDIVIDUAL RECOVER FROM PLAINTIFF LEON, ANA ALICIA SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT. DEFENDANTS ARE ENTITLED TO REASONABLE COSTS OF SUIT AND ATTORNEYS FEES ACCORDING TO PROOF BY NOTICED MOTION TO BE FILED WITH THE COURT.

MINUTES FOR APR-28-2010 10:00 AM

MINUTES FOR APR-28-2010 10:00 AM

ORDER

ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS TO DEFENDANTS IN CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS TO DEFENDANTS IN CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON APR-28-2010 IN DEPT. 602, MTN FOR AN AWARD OF ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS GRANTED, PURSUANT TO WRITTEN ORDER. JUDGE C. KIESSELBACH, CLERK N. REGAS, CT REPORTER C. YOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR APR-28-2010 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $227.68 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE APR-06-2010, FILED BY DEFENDANT SANDER, SUKHI AN INDIVIDUAL SANDER BROTHERS ENTERPRISES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOMBAY INDIAN RESTAURANT SINGH, JUJAAR AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • MTN FOR AN AWARD OF ATTY'S FEES, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT SANDER, SUKHI AN INDIVIDUAL SANDER BROTHERS ENTERPRISES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOMBAY INDIAN RESTAURANT SINGH, JUJAAR AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR APR-28-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 602 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT DEFENDANT SANDER, SUKHI AN INDIVIDUAL SANDER BROTHERS ENTERPRISES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOMBAY INDIAN RESTAURANT SINGH, JUJAAR AN INDIVIDUAL RECOVER FROM PLAINTIFF LEON, ANA ALICIA SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT. DEFENDANTS ARE ENTITLED TO REASONABLE COSTS OF SUIT AND ATTORNEYS FEES ACCORDING TO PROOF BY NOTICED MOTION TO BE FILED WITH THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ORDER & STIPULATION TO RETURN ALL TRIAL EXHIBITS & DEPOSITIONS TO RESPECTIVE COUNSEL FOR SAFE-KEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON FEB-02-2010 IN DEPT. 602 - COURT FINDS JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TO PREPARE JUDGMENT. JUDGE CHARLENE P. KIESSELBACH, CLERK N. REGAS, CT REPORTER C. YOUNT (602)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • TRIAL CONCLUDED. IN 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR FEB-01-2010 10:50 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF FEB-01-2010 ASSIGNED TO COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON FEB-01-2010 AT 10:50 AM IN DEPT. 602, CHARLENE PANDOVANI KIESSELBACH. TIME ESTIMATE: 2 HOURS. JUDGE: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN; CLERK: E. BURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: DIDALEUSKY, C. MATTHEW SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR SANDER, SUKHI AN INDIVIDUAL SANDER BROTHERS ENTERPRISES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOMBAY INDIAN RESTAURANT SINGH, JUJAAR AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY APPELLANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF APPEAL AND NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY APPELLANT LEON, ANA ALICIA SERVED NOV-12-2009, MAIL ON RESPONDENT SANDER, SUKHI AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF APPEAL AND NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY APPELLANT LEON, ANA ALICIA SERVED NOV-12-2009, MAIL ON RESPONDENT SANDER BROTHERS ENTERPRISES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOMBAY INDIAN RESTAURANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • POS OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF APPEAL AND NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY APPELLANT LEON, ANA ALICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE MAILED (LABOR APPEAL) COURT TRIAL SET FOR FEB-01-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • NTC OF RELATED CASE FILED BY APPELLANT LEON, ANA ALICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL OF THE ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY APPELLANT LEON, ANA ALICIA AS TO RESPONDENT SANDER, SUKHI AN INDIVIDUAL SANDER BROTHERS ENTERPRISES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOMBAY INDIAN RESTAURANT SINGH, JUJAAR AN INDIVIDUAL JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less