Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:49:42 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK VS. VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8473

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendants

VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS

VILLACARLOS, ROEL

San Francisco, CA 94112

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

HOFFMANN, MARTIN

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

1320 Willow Pass Road, Suite 730

Concord, CA 94520

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $289.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS VILLACARLOS, ROEL

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK SERVED FEB-24-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY, RETURNED UNSERVED AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS VILLACARLOS, ROEL $9,284.93 PRINCIPAL, $289.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $9,574.43, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2014
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY, RETURNED UNSERVED AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $.00 INTEREST, $248.00 COSTS, M/D = 3/26/14 FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS VILLACARLOS, ROEL $9,284.93 PRINCIPAL, $289.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $9,574.43, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $289.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS VILLACARLOS, ROEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • FEE PAID ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK SERVED FEB-24-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK AS TO DEFENDANT VILLACARLOS, ROEL, A/K/A ROEL C VILLACARLOS DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less