Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:48:06 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS. RAY DOLAN et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAY DOLAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8450

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendants

DOLAN, RAY

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

HOFFMANN, MARTIN

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

1320 Willow Pass Road, Suite 730

Concord, CA 94520

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB AS TO DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:370.00)

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY $10,259.23 PRINCIPAL, $434.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,693.73, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $434.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $40.00 AS TO DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB SERVED FEB-25-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $.00 INTEREST, $49.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY $10,259.23 PRINCIPAL, $434.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,693.73, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $434.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $40.00 AS TO DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB AS TO DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB SERVED FEB-25-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB AS TO DEFENDANT DOLAN, RAY DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less