Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:48:14 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS. JOSUE LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSUE LOPEZ. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8452

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendant

LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, HARVEY M.

Attorney at THE MOORE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

3710 S. Susan Street, Ste. 210, P.O. Box 25145 [92799]

Santa Ana, CA 92704

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB AS TO DEFENDANT LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:225.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB SERVED FEB-24-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

STIPULATED JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL $3,620.37 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,620.37, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB AS TO DEFENDANT LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL $3,620.37 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,620.37, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR STIPULATED JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB AS TO DEFENDANT LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • WAIVER OF INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB SERVED FEB-24-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB AS TO DEFENDANT LOPEZ, JOSUE AN INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less