Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:50:05 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK VS. WILLIAM G. BROUCEK et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAM G BROUCEK. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8479

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

Defendants

BROUCEK, WILLIAM G. ASK WILLIAM G. ROUCEK

DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL, LINA M

Attorney at MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

555 St. Charles Drive, Suite 204

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK SERVED MAR-18-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT BROUCEK, WILLIAM G. ASK WILLIAM G. ROUCEK

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK AS TO DEFENDANT BROUCEK, WILLIAM G. ASK WILLIAM G. ROUCEK DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS; DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - DISMISSAL ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK SERVED MAR-18-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT BROUCEK, WILLIAM G. ASK WILLIAM G. ROUCEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • POS; DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK AS TO DEFENDANT BROUCEK, WILLIAM G. ASK WILLIAM G. ROUCEK DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less