*******1363
08/19/2022
Not Classified By Court
Other
San Francisco, California
SAMUEL K. FENG
ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO
ETHAN P. SCHULMAN
RICHARD B. ULMER
AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
FRANCHISE TAX BOARD
PACHTER, RICHARD
BESSEY, NATHANIEL A
EISENTEIN, MARTIN I.
SIEGEL, KARA
ROBBINS, LAURA E.
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100196791) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
DECLARATION OF RONALD SOLOMON (TRANSACTION ID # 100196791) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100196791) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE A166954, DIV 5
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100183248) FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARD
ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY MARTIN I. EISENTEIN FILED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY NATHANIEL A BESSEY FILED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210014417) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARD NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-18-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-18-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-27-2022 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE
ORDER FOLLOWING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (TRANS# 71155591)
MINUTES FOR OCT-05-2023 1:30 PM
DECLARATION OF THIRD RONALD SOLOMON (TRANSACTION ID # 71021422) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
DECLARATION OF SECOND RONALD SOLOMON (TRANSACTION ID # 71021422) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
DECLARATION OF RONALD SOLOMON (TRANSACTION ID # 71021422) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
DECLARATION OF SECOND PAUL MILLER (TRANSACTION ID # 71021422) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
DECLARATION OF PAUL MILLER (TRANSACTION ID # 71021422) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
DECLARATION OF ALFREDO RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARDS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 71021422) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
DECLARATION OF LAURIE MCELHATTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARD'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 71021422) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY MARTIN I. EISENTEIN; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO
[-] Read LessHearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY NATHANIEL A BESSEY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO
[-] Read LessHearingMatter(s): MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION \/Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Adjudication On Count Two Of Its Complaint; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 304; Judge Name: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN
[-] Read LessHearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Sep-27-2023 Advanced From Oct-26-23 To Oct-05-23 At 01:30 P.M. In Dept 304; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 304; Judge Name: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN
[-] Read LessHearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR COURT Off Calendar Sep-06-2023 Vacated; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO
[-] Read LessDocketORDER FOLLOWING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (TRANS# 71155591)
[-] Read LessHearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Oct-05-2023 Text Ruling; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 304; Judge Name: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLEX LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD ON OCT-05-2023, IN DEPT. 304. THE COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER RE THE CASE STATUS. A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS NOT SCHEDULED. THE PREVIOUSLY RESERVED HEARING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION REMAINS ON CALENDAR FOR DEC-14-2023, AT 9:00 A.M. JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN; CLERK: FELICIA GREEN; COURT REPORTER: ASHLEY HILL, CSR NO. 3906, TEL: 855.777.7865; EMAIL: CSRASHLEYA.HILL@GMAIL.COM; DEPT. 304.
[-] Read LessDocketMINUTES FOR OCT-05-2023 1:30 PM
[-] Read LessDocketDECLARATION OF THIRD RONALD SOLOMON (TRANSACTION ID # 71021422) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
[-] Read LessFinancialPayment: APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; Amount: $500; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H2322830P003
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF GEORGE S. ISAACSON, MARTIN I. EISENSTEIN AND NATHANIEL A. BESSEY (TRANSACTION ID # 210014865) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE / VERIFIED APPLICATION PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF GEORGE S. ISAACSON (TRANSACTION ID # 210014865) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION HEARING SET FOR SEP-19-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302; Fee: $500.00
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE / VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARTIN I. EISENSTEIN (TRANSACTION ID # 210014865) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION HEARING SET FOR SEP-19-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302; Fee: $500.00
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE / VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NATHANIEL A. BESSEY (TRANSACTION ID # 210014865) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION HEARING SET FOR SEP-19-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302; Fee: $500.00
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210014417) TO PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION
[-] Read LessFinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $1435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122823F038
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210014417) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION CASE DESIGNATED COMPLEX LITIGATION
[-] Read LessDocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210014417) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARD NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-18-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-18-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-27-2022 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE; Fee: $1435.00
[-] Read LessCase Number: | *******1363 | |
Case Title: | AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION VS. FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
Court Date: | AUG-01-2023 09:30 AM | |
Calendar Matter: | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
Rulings: | Set for Law and Motion on Tuesday, August 1, 2023 Line 7,PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION's MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.Off calendar. The court designates this case as complex and it is assigned to Judge Schulman in department 304 for all purposes. Please contact his clerk at (415) 551-3729 to re-schedule the motion and other future hearings, if any. The court will issue a formal order. =(302/RBU) |
Case Number: | *******1363 | |
Case Title: | AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION VS. FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
Court Date: | JUN-20-2023 09:00 AM | |
Calendar Matter: | Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Further Responses To Interrogatories | |
Rulings: | Set for Discovery on Tuesday, June 20, 2023 Line 6,2-DEFENDANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARD's Motion To Compel Further Responses To Interrogatories.Pro Tem Judge Robert Kane, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:Parties to appear to discuss, amongst other issues, relevance to subject matter and privacy issues in light of nature of action. For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPARTMENT 301 DAILY AT 9:00 A.M.), or dial the corresponding number and use the meeting ID, and password for Department 301. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to rkane1089@aol.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem.=(302/JPT) |
Case Number: | *******1363 | |
Case Title: | AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION VS. FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
Court Date: | NOV-17-2022 09:30 AM | |
Calendar Matter: | DEMURRER to COMPLAINT | |
Rulings: | Matter on calendar for Thursday, November 17, 2022, Line 16,DEFENDANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARD'S DEMURRER to COMPLAINT.Hearing required. For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, please send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org to provide the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. = (302/RBU) |
Case Number: | *******1363 | |
Case Title: | AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION VS. FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
Court Date: | SEP-19-2022 09:30 AM | |
Calendar Matter: | MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |
Rulings: | Matter on calendar for Monday, September 19, 2022, Line 7, 1. PLAINTIFF AMERICAN CATALOG MAILERS ASSOCIATION'S MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE.Nathaniel Bessey's unopposed pro hac vice application is granted. For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested.The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. = (302/RBU) | |