This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:17:46 (UTC).

ALVA RANSFORD VS. AC AND S, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2007 ALVA RANSFORD filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AC AND S, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4342

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RANSFORD, ALVA

RANSFORD, ORA MYRTLE

Defendants

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO WESTINGHOUSE AIRBRAKE CO.

OWENS-ILLINOIS CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE US INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR- IN-INTEREST TO WORTHINGTON PUMP

PACCAR INC.

CRANE CO.

GARDNER DENVER, INC.

W.C. HENDRIE & CO. INCORPORATED, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CERTAINTEED CORP.

WABTEC CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND A SUCESSOR TO WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

ALL-STATE INDUSTRIES, INC.

SOCO WEST, INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST, INC.

WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, BORG WARNER MORSE TEC, INC.

MAREMONT CORPORATION

JOY TECHNOLOGIES INC.

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER, INC. FKA DB RILEY, INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

FRASER-EDWARDS CO.

88 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Ave, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DITTOE, JOHN EDWARD

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 2400

Oakland Ca, CA 94612-3572

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

FADEFF, JEFFERY J.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California Street,, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

TOWLE, EDMUND J

Attorney at TOWLE, DENISON, SMITH & TAVERA, LLP

10866 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 600

Los Angeles,, CA 90024

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

555 12Th Street, Suite 1280

Oakland, CA 94607

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

KROESCH, DOUGLAS A

Attorney at GALLAWA BROWN KROESCH ET AL

2207 J St

Sacramento, CA 95816

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 W. 5Th Street #700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St, Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO, LLP

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Floor, P. O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

28 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF STEPHEN M. TIGERMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. Sec. 2025.420

DECLARATION OF STEPHEN M. TIGERMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS' MO FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SEC. 2025.420 (TRANSACTION ID # 17326384) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

PLAINTIFFS??? REPLY TO DEFENDANT OLD ORCHARD INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO VAPOR CORPORATION???S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS??? MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

REPLY TO DEFT OLD ORCHARD INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION'S, OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 17621204) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 18135386) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

EXHIBITS A-B TO: DECLARATION OF PAUL VAILLANCOURT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT BY DEFENDANT JOY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 129, PLAINTIFFS STANDARD INTERROGAT

EXHIBITS A-B TO: DECLARATION OF PAUL VAILLANCOURT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT BY DEFENDANT JOY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 129, PLAINTIFFS STANDARD INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS FROM JOY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AND REQUEST FOR A MONETARY FINE AND MONETARY SAN (TRANSACTION ID # 18136018) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

DECLARATION OF SABRINA L. AXT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RILEY POWER, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF SABRINA L. AXT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RILEY POWER, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 18404214) FILED BY DEFENDANT RILEY POWER, INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS "BABCOCK BORSIG POWER, INC., AS THE PARENT, ALTER EGO, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST ANS AS THE ENTITIES FORMERLY KNOW AS DB RILEY, INC., AND/OR RILEY STOKER CORPORATION"

Declaration of Luiza Manuelian in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. with Exhibits A - H

DECLARATION OF LUIZA MANUELIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC. WITH EXHIBITS A - H (TRANSACTION ID # 18438354) FILED BY DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC.

Exhibit D in Support of Declaration of Lisa M. Rickenbacher in Support of Defendant Foster Wheeler LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication

EXHIBIT D IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF LISA M. RICKENBACHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 18455790) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANYS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

JURY FEES, TRAN # R0208219J002, TAG # 020277 (TRANSACTION ID # 18636650) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY (Fee:150.00)

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KATHERINE Y. WANG IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS??? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PNEUMO-ABEX LLC???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KATHERINE Y. WANG IN SUPPORT OPPOSITION TO DEFT PNEUMO-ABEX LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 18790448) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.???S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ALVA RANSFORD???S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16388503) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Answer To Complaint For Personal Injury And Loss of Consortium - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16396132) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION AS PRODUCT SUCCESSOR TO EIS BRAKE PARTS (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM- ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16453903) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

Vapor Power International, LLC, sued and served as Sixth Does Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16663459) FILED BY DEFENDANT VAPOR POWER INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Fee:335.00)

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT BY DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC., TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 129, PLAINTIFFS STANDARD INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS FROM GARDNER DENVER, INC., AND REQUEST FOR A MONETARY FINE AND MONETARY SANCT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT BY DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC., TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 129, PLAINTIFFS STANDARD INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS FROM GARDNER DENVER, INC., AND REQUEST FOR A MONETARY FINE AND MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC., AND ITS COUNSEL OF RECORD POOLE SHAFFERY, LLP (TRANSACTION ID # 18135386) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA HEARING SET FOR JAN-23-2008 AT 04:00 PM IN DEPT 613 (Fee:40.00)

EXHIBITS A-B TO THE DECLARATION OF PAUL VAILLANCOURT

EXHIBITS A-B TO THE DECLARATION OF PAUL VAILLANCOURT IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT (TRANSACTION ID # 18135386) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

OUT-OF-STATE AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TRANE U.S. INC. fka AMERICAN STANDARD INC. SUED HEREIN AS AMERICAN STANDARD INC., Individually and as successor-in-interest to WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE CO.????????s MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

OUT-OF-STATE AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TRANE U.S. INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC. SUED HEREIN AS AMERICAN STANDARD INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE CO.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 18497052) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRANE US INC., FORMERLY KNOWN AS AMERICAN STANDARD INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS AMERICAN STANDARD INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WESTINGHOUSE AIRBRAKE CO.)

EXHIBITS D -G TO THE DECLARATION OF KATHERINE Y. WANG

EXHIBITS D -G TO THE DECLARATION OF KATHERINE Y. WANG (TRANSACTION ID # 18719214) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

EXHIBITS H -Q TO THE APPENDIX OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO RAILROAD FRICTION PRODUCTS CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

EXHIBITS H -Q TO THE APPENDIX OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO RAILROAD FRICTION PRODUCTS CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 18741087) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

572 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2009
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR NOV-25-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28236400) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, PATRICIA L. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ALVA RANSFORD, DECEDENT RANSFORD, ORA MYRTLE RANSFORD, STEVEN RANSFORD, BRENDT RANSFORD, DAVID RANSFORD, SCOTT AND DOES ONE THROUGH TEN, INCLUSIVE AS TO DEFENDANT AC AND S, INC. BONDURA TEXACO, INC. ELEVENTH DOE THROUGH THREE HUNDREDTH DOE, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28236295) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF ALVA RANSFORD MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT/CROSS COMPLAINT/ANSWER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN, REPORTER: KENT GUBBINE, CSR #5797

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BRENDEN G. SULLIVAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27788083) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S MTN TO AMEND COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27788083) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT/CROSS COMPLAINT/ANSWER, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 27788083) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA HEARING SET FOR NOV-25-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR AFFIRMED (A121620, DIV. 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING (A121620, DIV. 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
663 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16200094) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16064091) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS SIXTH DOE TO BE VAPOR POWER INTERNATIONAL, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16064034) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS FIFTH DOE TO BE KAISER VENTURES LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO KAISER VENTURES, INC., SUCCESSOR TO KAISER STEEL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16063891) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS FOURTH DOE TO BE W.C. HENDRIE & CO. INCORPORATED, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16063820) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS THIRD DOE TO BE PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO SACOMO SIERRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16063766) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS SECOND DOE AND TWO HUNDRED SECOND DOE TO BE BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16063671) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS FIRST DOE AND TWO HUNDRED FIRST DOE TO BE PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR TO EIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RANSFORD, ALVA AS TO DEFENDANT AC AND S, INC. FIRST DOE THROUGH FOUR HUNDREDTH DOE ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-20-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less