This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 04:12:46 (UTC).

ALMA ARCINIEGAS VS. CORE CARE CENTER LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2013 ALMA ARCINIEGAS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CORE CARE CENTER LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5790

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARCINIEGAS, ALMA

MEJIA, CAMILO INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF ALMA ARCINIEGAS

Claimant

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Defendants

CORE CARE CENTER LLC

CORE CARE IMAGING CENTER, LLC

CRAWFORD, CINDY

KANE, ROBERT

WELL, MARC

KANE, DC, ROBERT ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROBERT KANE

WEILL, MARC

FLIR SYSTEMS, INC

KANE IR (BUSINESS ASSOCIATION, FORM UNKNOWN)

DOES 1 -100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARTWRIGHT, ROBERT EUGENE

Attorney at THE CARTWRIGHT LAW FIRM, INC.

222 Front Street, Fifth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Claimant Attorney

LEW, DEBRA DEE

Attorney at OFFICE OF TREASURER AND TAX COLLECTOR- LEGAL SECTION CITY AND COUNTYOF SAN FRANCISCO

P.O. Box 7426

San Francisco, CA 94120

Defendant Attorneys

PETERSEN, MARK DEAN

Attorney at FARELLA BRAUN & MARTEL LLP

235 Montgomery Street,, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROTHMAN, ROBERT J.

TREPPA, JAMES M

Attorney at BLEDSOE, CATHCART, DIESTEL, PEDERSEN & TREPPA LLP

601 California St 16Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94108

GIBSON, MARK R

Attorney at ABEL & KOWALSKI P.C.

1100 Larkspur Landing Circle, Ste 200

Larkspur, CA 94939

FRIEDER, THOMAS MICHAEL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

275 Battery St, Ste 1600

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS ROBERT KANE, DC, AND KANE IRa??S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFa??S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55980459) FILED BY DEFENDANT KANE IR (BUSINESS ASSOCIATION, FORM UNKNOWN) KANE, DC, ROBERT ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROBERT KANE

Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 56830209) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCINIEGAS, ALMA

DECLARATION OF MARK R. GIBSON IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFa??S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME

DECLARATION OF MARK R. GIBSON IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME (TRANSACTION ID # 56832792) FILED BY DEFENDANT KANE, DC, ROBERT ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROBERT KANE

DEFENDANTS CORE CARE CENTER, LLC AND MARC WEILLS JOINDER IN DEFENDANT FLIR SYSTEMS, INC. AND DR. ROBERT KANES OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFF ALMA ARCINIEGAS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PREFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING (JOINDER) (TRANSACTION ID # 57052430) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORE CARE CENTER LLC WEILL, MARC

PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 15103086) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCINIEGAS, ALMA

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57873261) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORE CARE CENTER LLC WEILL, MARC JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-30-2015 CONTINUED TO DEC-02-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF AMENDED COMPLAINT OR SUBSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFF. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINTLY) (TRANSACTION ID # 58448885) FILED BY DEFENDANT KANE IR (BUSINESS ASSOCIATION, FORM UNKNOWN) KANE, DC, ROBERT ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROBERT KANE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 14.0 DAYS

Notice of Motion for Order Continuing Pending Action by Decendents Per

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER CONTINUING PENDING ACTION BY DECENDENTS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (TRANSACTION ID # 58567148) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCINIEGAS, ALMA HEARING SET FOR MAR-16-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CORE CARE CENTER LLC WEILL, MARC (Fee:900.00)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: TREPPA, JAMES M SUBSTITUTED FOR ROTHMAN, ROBERT J. AS ATTORNEY FOR CRAWFORD, CINDY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT KANE, DC, ROBERT ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROBERT KANE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CRAWFORD, CINDY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

DEFENDANT DR. KANEa??S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFa??S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

DEFENDANT DR. KANE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 56944853) FILED BY DEFENDANT KANE IR (BUSINESS ASSOCIATION, FORM UNKNOWN) KANE, DC, ROBERT ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROBERT KANE

Declaration of Mark R. Gibson in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Trial Preference

DECLARATION OF MARK R. GIBSON IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 57044988) FILED BY DEFENDANT KANE IR (BUSINESS ASSOCIATION, FORM UNKNOWN) KANE, DC, ROBERT ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROBERT KANE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57870855) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRAWFORD, CINDY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100012351) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCINIEGAS, ALMA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58740781) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLIR SYSTEMS, INC JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO THE COMPLAINT AS TO KANE IR ONLY. EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COST AND ATTORNEY'S FEES.(TRANSACTION ID # 58828244)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58757448) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCINIEGAS, ALMA MEJIA, CAMILO INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF ALMA ARCINIEGAS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE PENDING ACTION BY DECENDANTS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58748853) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCINIEGAS, ALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58748853) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, CAMILO INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF ALMA ARCINIEGAS AS TO DEFENDANT CORE CARE CENTER LLC WEILL, MARC CRAWFORD, CINDY KANE, ROBERT KANE IR (BUSINESS ASSOCIATION, FORM UNKNOWN) FLIR SYSTEMS, INC DOES 1 -100, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-06-2016 CONTINUED TO MAY-18-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58740781) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLIR SYSTEMS, INC JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF ALMA ARCINIEGAS' MOTION FOR ORDER CONTINUING PENDING ACTION BY DECENDENTS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED AND GOOD CAUSE SHOWN. ORDER SIGNED. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: SEAN KANE; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR #5976 (302/HK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-16-2016 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE PENDING ACTION BY DECEDENT'S PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER CONTINUING PENDING ACTION BY DECENDENTS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (TRANSACTION ID # 58567148) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCINIEGAS, ALMA HEARING SET FOR MAR-16-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT FLIR SYSTEMS, INC (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • APPENDIX OF OUT OF STATE AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FLIR SYSTEMS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT FLIR SYSTEMS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT FLIR SYSTEMS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT FLIR SYSTEMS, INC HEARING SET FOR MAR-05-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CRAWFORD, CINDY (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCINIEGAS, ALMA SERVED DEC-16-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JAN-06-2014 ON DEFENDANT KANE, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCINIEGAS, ALMA AS TO DEFENDANT CORE CARE CENTER LLC CORE CARE IMAGING CENTER, LLC WEILL, MARC CRAWFORD, CINDY KANE, ROBERT KANE IR (BUSINESS ASSOCIATION, FORM UNKNOWN) FLIR SYSTEMS, INC DOES 1 -100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-30-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-27-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-07-2014 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less