This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 05:11:03 (UTC).

ALLISON CHEN VS. SEPHORA USA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2013 ALLISON CHEN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SEPHORA USA, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6260

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEN, ALLISON

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

SEPHORA USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINNIS, AARON P

Defendant Attorney

LIVINGSTON, ANDREW RALSTON

Attorney at ORRICK, HERINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEN, ALLISON AS TO DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-21-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-18-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-28-2014 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEN, ALLISON SERVED DEC-20-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC. (Fee:450.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-21-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-20-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEN, ALLISON JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-20-2014 CONTINUED TO OCT-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC.

ORDER

ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE GRANTING ATTORNEY MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR MINNIS, AARON P AS ATTORNEY FOR CHEN, ALLISON

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-08-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSED PER SEPT-03-2014 ORDER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-08-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSED PER SEPT-03-2014 ORDER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DISMISSING THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR MINNIS, AARON P AS ATTORNEY FOR CHEN, ALLISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, THE LAW FIRM OF MINNIS & SMALLETS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF ALLISON CHEN (DECEASED) IS GRANTED. THE CASE WAS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE OVER THE OBJECTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. 2 ORDERS SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER: SHERYL L. SAWYER, CSR #5976 =302/EG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-03-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • STATEMENT REGARDING ATTORNEY'S MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-20-2014 CONTINUED TO OCT-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEN, ALLISON JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEN, ALLISON (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEN, ALLISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEN, ALLISON HEARING SET FOR SEP-03-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-21-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-20-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC. (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEN, ALLISON SERVED DEC-20-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEN, ALLISON AS TO DEFENDANT SEPHORA USA, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-21-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-18-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-28-2014 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less