This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:39:37 (UTC).

ALFRED PERRY VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2007 ALFRED PERRY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4057

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRY, ALFRED

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SUN SHIP, LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

CRANE CO.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

SUN SHIP, INC.

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center,, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

NELSON, EVAN CRAIG

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

135 Main Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

WHITIS, GAVIN

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Ave, Ste2850

Los Angeles, CA 97001

ZELDIN, KIM STACY

Attorney at LINER GRODE STEIN YANKELEVITZ SUNSHINE REGENSTREIF & TAYLOR LLP

1999 Fremont Street, 20Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94105-2255

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS

135 Main Street, Ste 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

PFALZER, THOMAS E

Attorney at MCNAMARA, DODGE, NEY, BEATTY, SLATTERY, PFALZER, BORGES & BROTHERS LLP

1211 Newell Avenue, P.O. Box 5288

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KRAFT, ROBERT S

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF RITA Y.B. CARLSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AT PLAINTIFF?S DEPOSITION AND SANCT

DECLARATION OF RITA Y.B. CARLSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AT PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION AND SANCT (TRANSACTION ID # 23785736) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

CONTINUING EXHIBITS G THORUGH I TO THE DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. HUNTOON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDCIATION - Alfred Perry SFSFC

CONTINUING EXHIBITS G THORUGH I TO THE DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. HUNTOON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDCIATION - ALFRED PERRY SFSFC (TRANSACTION ID # 22283334) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

Request for Dismissal- Goulds Pumps Inc.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22955446) AS TO DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC.

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC?S UNTIMELY OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AN

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS UNTIMELY OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION, AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 22564339) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERRY, ALFRED

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 20433645) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, INC.

PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 22125480) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERRY, ALFRED

FOSTER WHEELER LLCS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF FOSTER WHEELER LLCS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF FOSTER WHEELER LLCS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 22546304) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST FOSTER WHEELER LLC (TRANSACTION ID # 25459942) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERRY, ALFRED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14627253) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC (Fee:335.00)

234 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 37977408) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37817481) AS TO DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • DocketREFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 23733 FOR TRANSACTION W2109622J024 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1903684016, WARRANT #38200778, DATED MAY-20-2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-26-2011. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37645128)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36901040) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-26-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35971090) AS TO DEFENDANT NORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIP SYSTEMS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
270 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14376726) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC. (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 14338927) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION - TURBO PUMP OPERATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT FMC CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 14338927) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION - TURBO PUMP OPERATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14338927) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION - TURBO PUMP OPERATION (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF. BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 14297231) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF. BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TIME. (TRANSACTION ID # 14297231) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14297231) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERRY, ALFRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERRY, ALFRED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, D, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN SHIP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PLANT INSULATION, LLC, DBA/AKA PLANT INSULATION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THORPE INSULATION COMPANY is a litigant