Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 15:37:17 (UTC).

ALBERTO AVILA VS. ANTHONY HALLIGAN PLASTERING INC., et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2011 ALBERTO AVILA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ANTHONY HALLIGAN PLASTERING INC . This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5659

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

AVILA, ALBERTO

San Francisco, CA 94103

Respondents

HALLIGAN, ANTHONY KEVIN

ANTHONY HALLIGAN PLASTERING INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

SANCHEZ, ERNESTO

Attorney at LIBERATION LAW GROUP PC

2760 Mission St

San Francisco, CA 94110

Respondent Attorney

PIRRONE, DAVID J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PIRRONE & PIRRONE LLP

503 Seaport Court Ste 105

Redwood City, CA 94063

Other Attorneys

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney at STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONSCOLLECTION UNIT

455 Golden Gate Ave 10Th Flr.E

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

LABOR COMMISSION APPEAL

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF THE ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER (EMPLOYEE) FILED BY APPELLANT AVILA, ALBERTO AS TO RESPONDENT ANTHONY HALLIGAN PLASTERING INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HALLIGAN, ANTHONY KEVIN JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:IFP)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial (Labor Appeal)

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE MAILED (LABOR APPEAL) COURT TRIAL SET FOR JUN-03-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: SANCHEZ, ERNESTO SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR AVILA, ALBERTO

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY APPELLANT AVILA, ALBERTO

MINUTES FOR JUN-03-2013 10:00 AM

MINUTES FOR JUN-03-2013 10:00 AM

MINUTES FOR JUN-07-2013 9:30 AM

MINUTES FOR JUN-07-2013 9:30 AM

STATEMENT OF DECISION

STATEMENT OF DECISION - C.C.P. 632

WITNESS LIST

WITNESS LIST FILED

EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS

EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED

EXHIBIT LIST

EXHIBIT LIST FILED

ORDER

ORDER TO RETURN OR DESTROY EXHIBITS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO RETURN OR DESTROY EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT LIST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WITNESS LIST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DECISION - C.C.P. 632

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • NOT REPORTED. COURT TRIAL HELD ON JUN-07-2013, IN DEPT. 303. WITNESSES SWORN AND EXAMINED. DECISION RENDERED. COURT SHALL PREPARE WRITTEN DECISION. JUDGE RICHARD A. KRAMER; CLERK FELICIA GREEN; DEPT. 303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • TRIAL CONCLUDED. IN 1.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • TRIAL COMMENCED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR JUN-07-2013 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • NOT REPORTED. COURT TRIAL HELD ON JUN-03-2013, IN DEPT. 303. THE COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER RE TRIAL SCHEDULING. THE ACTION IS CONTINUED TO JUN-07-2013, AT 9:30 AM, IN DEPT. 303, FOR FURTHER COURT TRIAL. JUDGE RICHARD A. KRAMER; CLERK FELICIA GREEN; DEPT. 303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR JUN-03-2013 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF JUN-03-2013 ASSIGNED TO COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON JUN-03-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 303, RICHARD A. KRAMER. TIME ESTIMATE: 1-2 DAYS. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: E. BURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY APPELLANT AVILA, ALBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: SANCHEZ, ERNESTO SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR AVILA, ALBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE MAILED (LABOR APPEAL) COURT TRIAL SET FOR JUN-03-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY APPELLANT AVILA, ALBERTO ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL OF THE ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER (EMPLOYEE) FILED BY APPELLANT AVILA, ALBERTO AS TO RESPONDENT ANTHONY HALLIGAN PLASTERING INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HALLIGAN, ANTHONY KEVIN JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less