This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:25:19 (UTC).

ALBERT WRIGHT JR` et al VS. A.W. CHERSTON COMPANY, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2007 ALBERT WRIGHT JR filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHERSTON COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4382

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRIGHT, MARVA JOE GREEN

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

NIBCO INC.

DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS, L.P. F/K/A AZROCK INDUSTRIES INC., A CORPORATION, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS DOMCO INC., FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS)

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

GRINNELL LLC

J. T. THORPE & SON, INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

A.W. CHERSTON COMPANY, INC.

FAIRBANKS MORSE PUMP CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

DOMCO, INC. FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS), INDIVIDUALLY AND SII TO AXROCK INDUSTRIES, INC.

3M COMPANY

TRANE US INC., FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC IMPROPERLY SUED AS STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), INC., DBA AND INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, INDIAN HEAD

VIACOM INC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CBS CORPORATION

JOHN K. BICE COMPANY, INC.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHBACK, STEPHEN M.

Attorney at KELLER, FISHBACK & JACKSON LLP

18425 Burbank Blvd., Ste. 610

Tarzana, CA 91356-6918

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

TINKOFF, SHELLEY K

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main St., 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-1812

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Flr

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES

275 Battery St 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Ave, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

Other Attorneys

MURRAY, JOHN JOSEPH

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133-2122

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

PROSSER, DEBORAH C.

Attorney at KUTAK ROCK LLP

515 So. Figueroa Street, Suite 1240

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3329

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Center,, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111-3941

16 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WRIGHT JR`, ALBERT WRIGHT, MARVA JOE GREEN AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHERSTON COMPANY, INC. AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-20-2008 (Fee:335.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16669167) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Warren Pumps, LLCs Objection to Assignment of Commissioner for Trial

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 16669167) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

Defendant Warren Pumps, LLCs Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16669167) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

Proof of Service by Electronic Submission

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SUBMISSION OF ANSWER (TRANSACTION ID # 16669167) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

Defendant Rapid-American Corporations Answer to Unverified Complaint for Damages

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16673379) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16677312) FILED BY DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC IMPROPERLY SUED AS STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), INC., DBA AND INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, INDIAN HEAD (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLCS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 16677312) FILED BY DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC IMPROPERLY SUED AS STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), INC., DBA AND INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, INDIAN HEAD

Request for dismissal as to defendant Buffalo Pumps, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL COSTS WAIVER, FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 26728255) AS TO DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27210336) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 27341399) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal as to Def Georgia-Pacific LLC, only with a mutual costs waiver.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27346555) AS TO DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

ORDER

ORDER AWARDING METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION'S COSTS

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28265147) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT KENTILE FLOORS, INC.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 28574448) AS TO DEFENDANT KENTILE FLOORS, INC.

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Domco, Inc. Floor Products (Texas), Individually and sii to Azrock Industries, Inc., only with a mutual waiver of costs.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 28638666) AS TO DEFENDANT DOMCO, INC. FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS), INDIVIDUALLY AND SII TO AXROCK INDUSTRIES, INC.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29136138) AS TO DEFENDANT J. T. THORPE & SON, INC.

949 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29136138) AS TO DEFENDANT J. T. THORPE & SON, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 28638666) AS TO DEFENDANT DOMCO, INC. FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS), INDIVIDUALLY AND SII TO AXROCK INDUSTRIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 28574448) AS TO DEFENDANT KENTILE FLOORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28265147) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AWARDING METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION'S COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27346555) AS TO DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 27341399) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27210336) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL COSTS WAIVER, FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 26728255) AS TO DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26667981) AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
1,088 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 16677312) FILED BY DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC IMPROPERLY SUED AS STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), INC., DBA AND INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, INDIAN HEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16677312) FILED BY DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC IMPROPERLY SUED AS STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), INC., DBA AND INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, INDIAN HEAD (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16673379) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SUBMISSION OF ANSWER (TRANSACTION ID # 16669167) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16669167) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 16669167) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16669167) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF WRIGHT JR`, ALBERT WRIGHT, MARVA JOE GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WRIGHT JR`, ALBERT WRIGHT, MARVA JOE GREEN AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHERSTON COMPANY, INC. AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-20-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less