This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/01/2019 at 14:01:05 (UTC).

ALBERT LEONG ET AL VS. BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by ALBERT LEONG against BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4290

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEONG, LINDA

LEONG, ALBERT

LEONG, LINDA INDIVIDUAL

LEONG, ALBERT INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC.

REDWOOD PROPERTY INVESTORS II, LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-26-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-20-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Answer to First Amended Complaint

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100036423) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100063376) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100074210) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT INDIVIDUAL LEONG, LINDA INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Order Setting Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR FEB-20-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS AND TRIAL SETTING. THE JAN-08-2019 CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR - SETTLEMENT WAS AS TO ONE DEFENDANT ONLY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Removal of Action

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100036449) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100036449) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE [CONDITIONAL - 11/23/18] (TRANSACTION ID # 100049245) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT LEONG, LINDA

Notice of Seasides Declaration of Nonmonetary Status

NOTICE OF SEASIDES DECLARATION OF NONMONETARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 100077084) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-02-2018 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) REDWOOD PROPERTY INVESTORS II, LLC AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE AUG-29-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100061907) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Plaintiffs Objection to Defendant Seaside Trustee, Incs Declaration of

OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INCS DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 64095989) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT LEONG, LINDA

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR OCT-28-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint

AMENDED ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100036432) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC.

Defendant Bayview Loan Servicing, LLCs Objection to Trial Date and Req

DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLCS OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE AND REQUEST TO BE HEARD ON FEBRUARY 20, 2019 (TRANSACTION ID # 100063376) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18105028), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT INDIVIDUAL LEONG, LINDA INDIVIDUAL SERVED FEB-22-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT REDWOOD PROPERTY INVESTORS II, LLC

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100061853) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT LEONG, LINDA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1519607M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1519607M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R4919417J013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R9918A25F014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1518504F027

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1518504F025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1018213F021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INCS DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 64095989) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT LEONG, LINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF SEASIDE'S DECLARATION OF NONMONETARY STATUS, ETC. (TRANSACTION ID # 100077084) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NONMONETARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 100077084) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100036423) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100036423) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 18105028) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT INDIVIDUAL LEONG, LINDA INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18105028) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT INDIVIDUAL LEONG, LINDA INDIVIDUAL SERVED FEB-22-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT REDWOOD PROPERTY INVESTORS II, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18105028), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT INDIVIDUAL LEONG, LINDA INDIVIDUAL SERVED FEB-22-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT REDWOOD PROPERTY INVESTORS II, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED MAR-30-2018, SERVED MAR-13-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 18105028) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT INDIVIDUAL LEONG, LINDA INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 18081014) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT INDIVIDUAL LEONG, LINDA INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18044049) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT INDIVIDUAL LEONG, LINDA INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC. REDWOOD PROPERTY INVESTORS II, LLC DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEONG, ALBERT LEONG, LINDA AS TO DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC SEASIDE TRUSTEE, INC. REDWOOD PROPERTY INVESTORS II, LLC DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less