This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 10:52:05 (UTC).

ALAN J. BERGESON VS. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2005 ALAN J BERGESON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4023

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERGESON, ALAN J.

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

YARWAY CORPORATION

M. ARGUESO & CO.,INC. INSCORRECTLY SUED AS M. ARGUESO & CO.,INC. IND. AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO J.F. MCCAUGHN AS SII TO THE DICK ELLS COMPANY

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL,INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

KERR MANUFACTURING CORPORATION

WARREN PUMPS,LLC

CRANE CO.

GARDNER DENVER, INC.

IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. FKA IMO DELAVAL, INC.

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

BELL GROUP, INC., THE, DBA RIO GRNADE

STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC FKA STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), INC.

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVIN, WILLIAM ANDREW

Attorney at LEVIN SIMES & KAISER LLP

One Bush Street, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

SCADDEN, JAMES G.

Attorney at CARROLL, BURDICK & MCDONOUGH LLP

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

PFALZER, THOMAS E

Attorney at MCNAMARA, DODGE, NEY, BEATTY, SLATTERY, PFALZER & BORGES LLP

1211 Newell Avenue, Post Office Box 5288

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Street Tower,8T Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

VASQUEZ, MICHAEL ANTHONY

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADA

914 Mission Ave, 2Nd Flr

San Rafael, CA 94901

EASTER, LAURIE

Attorney at JACKSON WALKER, LLP

1401 Mckinney, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

POWERS, JOHN JOSEPH

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

50 Fremont Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SHAFFERY, JOHN

Poole & Shaffery, Llp, 445 South Figueroa St. #2520

Los Angeles, CA 90071

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at F0LEY & MANSFIED PLLP

1333 North California Blvd.,, Suite 690

Walnut, Creek, CA 94596

BERNARD, RANDALL K

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market St., 17Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94105-2722

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

ABBOTT, JAMES E.

Attorney at BOLLINGER, RUBERRY AND GARVEY

500 W. Madison Street,, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60661

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT, BROWN & BONESTEEL, L.L.P.

100 Bush Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-3967

REYEN, KEITH PATRICK

Attorney at OIUM REYEN & PRYOR

220 Montgomery Street, Ste 910

San Francisco, CA 94104

KRAFT, ROBERT S

Attorney at BASSI,MARTINI & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

BERRY, PHILLIP SAMUEL

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue, Po Box 16070

Oakland, CA 94610-0000

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERGESON, ALAN J. AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY FIRST DOE THROUGH THREE HUNDREDTH DOE, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-16-2006 (Fee:295.50)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE KERR MANUFACTURING CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS,INC. (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC . SUED AS ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL,INC. (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CARRIER CORPORATION (Fee:292.20)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE KERR CORPORATION WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS SDS KERR CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC. (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT YARWAY CORPORATION (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. (Fee:292.20)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27030117) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS ILLINOIS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 26897496) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS ILINOIS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 20106576) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20040764) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17802910) AS TO DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. FKA IMO DELAVAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13770073) AS TO DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13606217) AS TO DEFENDANT KENTILE FLOORS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13354297) AS TO DEFENDANT CSR, LTD. AKA COLONIAL SUGAR REFINERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13118719) AS TO DEFENDANT VIACOM, INCORPORATED AS SBM TO CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12884302) AS TO DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (Fee:292.20)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS,INC. (Fee:292.20)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2005
  • DocketDEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS,INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2005
  • DocketOBJECTION TO STIP OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS,INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:292.20)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED (Fee:292.20)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE KERR MANUFACTURING CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2005
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING/ASBESTOS LITIGATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERGESON, ALAN J. AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY FIRST DOE THROUGH THREE HUNDREDTH DOE, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-16-2006 (Fee:295.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YARWAY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant