Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/11/2017 at 06:01:11 (UTC).

AFSHIN SAZEGARI ET AL VS. RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2017 AFSHIN SAZEGARI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN and TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0001

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAZEGARI, AFSHIN

RAMEZANI, FATEMEH

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA

CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK

DOES 1 TO 100

ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO

TANDJUNG, SUWANDI

ROES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LABEL, ANTHONY L.

Attorney at THE VEEN FIRM P.C.

P O Box 7296

San Francisco, CA 941207296

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

JOOST, WILLIAM EDWARD

Attorney at JOOST LAW & MEDIATION

7 Mt. Lassen Drive, #C-110

San Rafael, CA 94903

HURLEY, BETH

Attorney at SANTA CRUZ, BROWNWOOD & CANNON

P.O. Box 85462

San Diego, CA 921865462

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-06-2017 CONTINUED TO JAN-17-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE ' SERVE ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement - Enkhchimeg

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100026470) (TRANSACTION ID # 100026470) FILED BY DEFENDANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Proof of Service of notice of motion to be relieved as counsel on Saze

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ON SAZEGARI (TRANSACTION ID # 61337991) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH

Proof of Service of Notice of Motion to be relieved as counsel on Rame

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ON RAMEZANI (TRANSACTION ID # 61337955) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH

Notice of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

NOTICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 61269861) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH HEARING SET FOR NOV-15-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Declaration of Steven A. Kronenberg ISO of Ex Parte App for an OST for

DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. KRONENBERG ISO OF EX PARTE APP FOR AN OST FOR THE HEARING OF PLAINTFFS COUNSELS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 61259393) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH

Ex Parte App for an Order Shortening Time for the Hearing on Plaintiff

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 61259393) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH

Enkhchimet, et al - Answer to Cross-Complaint

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100022280) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI

Cross-Complaint

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100020774) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA ROES 1-100

Answer to first amended complaint

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100020774) FILED BY DEFENDANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60931128) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI DOES 1 TO 100

Proof of Service of Summons on Tsogzolboo Enkhchimeg

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60873368), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH SERVED JUL-18-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO

Proof of Service of Summons on Roderick Hilario

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60873368), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH SERVED JUL-17-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK

Proof of Service on Ana Carina Cortez Hilario

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60873368), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH SERVED JUL-17-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUL-18-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK

First Amended Complaint

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60868460) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH AS TO DEFENDANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI DOES 1 TO 100

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH AS TO DEFENDANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-06-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-05-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-13-2017

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2017
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4717A24R008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4717A24M007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W1717A18M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4717814J008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4717814F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4917803F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W0917707F012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-06-2017 CONTINUED TO JAN-17-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE ' SERVE ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100026470) (TRANSACTION ID # 100026470) FILED BY DEFENDANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-15-2017 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100020774) FILED BY DEFENDANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60931128) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI DOES 1 TO 100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60931128) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60873368), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH SERVED JUL-18-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60873368), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH SERVED JUL-17-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60873368), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH SERVED JUL-17-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUL-18-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60868460) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH AS TO DEFENDANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI DOES 1 TO 100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAZEGARI, AFSHIN RAMEZANI, FATEMEH AS TO DEFENDANT CORTEZ HILARIO, RODERICK CORTEZ HILARIO, ANA CARINA ENKHCHIMEG, TSOGZOLBOO TANDJUNG, SUWANDI DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-06-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-05-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-13-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LABEL, ANTHONY L.