This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 21:43:52 (UTC).

ADIL AIT OUCHRAA VS. OUAHIBA KHOURCHECH ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 ADIL AIT OUCHRAA filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against OUAHIBA KHOURCHECH. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6795

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OUCHRAA, ADIL AIT A/K/A ADAM MUHAMMED

Defendants

DOES 1-20

KHOURCHECH, OUAHIBA A/K/A WAHIBA KHARCHICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRUZMAN, ALEKSANDR

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALEKSANDR GRUZMAN

7703 Santa Monica Blvd, Ste 1

West Hollywood, CA 90046

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $435; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : C7121B30F042

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDEFAMATION, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100148026) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OUCHRAA, ADIL AIT A/K/A ADAM MUHAMMED AS TO DEFENDANT KHOURCHECH, OUAHIBA A/K/A WAHIBA KHARCHICH DOES 1-20 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-27-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-24-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-04-2022 (Fee:$435.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6795
Case Title:ADIL AIT OUCHRAA VS. OUAHIBA KHOURCHECH ET AL
Court Date:FEB-24-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, February 24, 2022 Line 13, PLAINTIFF ADIL OUCHRAA MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICEPlaintiff's Motion to Admit Counsel Arkady Bukh Pro Hac Vice is granted. Plaintiff's counsel is required to prepare a proposed order and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing.Effective Monday, January 3, 2022, for the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. =(302/SRB)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRUZMAN ALEKSANDR LAW OFFICES OF