Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/29/2018 at 00:56:11 (UTC).

ADAM GALLOWAY VS. HEIDI HUDSON et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 ADAM GALLOWAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HEIDI HUDSON. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8484

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALLOWAY, ADAM

Defendants

HUDSON, HEIDI

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON, DEVIN N.

6110 N. Lombard, Suite B

Portland, OR 97203

Defendant Attorney

BOGAARDS, DEBRA FINK

Attorney at BOGAARDS DAVIS LLP

535 Pacific Avenue, Ste 101

San Francisco, CA 94133

 

Court Documents

Order to Arbitration

ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR SEP-09-2013. JUL-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

THE ARBITRATION ASSIGNMENT DATE OF SEP-09-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HUDSON, HEIDI (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALLOWAY, ADAM SERVED FEB-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HUDSON, HEIDI

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALLOWAY, ADAM AS TO DEFENDANT HUDSON, HEIDI DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513313F030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1213204F020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE ARBITRATION ASSIGNMENT DATE OF SEP-09-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR SEP-09-2013. JUL-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HUDSON, HEIDI (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALLOWAY, ADAM SERVED FEB-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HUDSON, HEIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALLOWAY, ADAM AS TO DEFENDANT HUDSON, HEIDI DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less