Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:47:48 (UTC).

AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE VS. VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA UTAH INSURANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8446

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendants

VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC.

DOES 1 TO 25, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JANG ALAN J

JANG, ALAN J

Attorney at JANG & ASSOCIATES

1766 Lacassie Ave Ste 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $795.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

RESPONSE TO CONTINUED OSC RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE

DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC. $142,669.99 PRINCIPAL, $22,680.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $28,533.80 INTEREST, $795.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $194,678.79, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-04-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-06-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-05-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE MAY-06-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-05-2014 CONTINUED TO NOV-04-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE AUG-05-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-01-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-04-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE OCT-01-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, ( NO SASE) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE AS TO DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-04-2014 CONTINUED TO MAY-06-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE FEB-04-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE AS TO DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-01-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE AUG-21-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE AS TO DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC. DOES 1 TO 25, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NTC OF PROVE-UP HEARING AND BRIEF STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE HEARING SET FOR OCT-07-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE SERVED APR-26-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-21-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-04-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC. $142,669.99 PRINCIPAL, $22,680.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $28,533.80 INTEREST, $795.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $194,678.79, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-07-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF OCT-07-2014, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 25, INCL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NTC OF PROVE-UP HEARING AND BRIEF STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE HEARING SET FOR OCT-07-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, ( NO SASE) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE AS TO DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT **STRAIGHT DEFAULT** FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE AS TO DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-01-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE AUG-21-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE AS TO DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT **STRAIGHT DEFAULT** FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE AS TO DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-21-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSURANCE EXCHANGE AS TO DEFENDANT VANDERBUILT CONSTRUCTION, INC. DOES 1 TO 25, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less