This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 13:36:04 (UTC).

640 OCTAVIA, LLC VS. KARL HEINZ PIEPER ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 640 OCTAVIA, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KARL HEINZ PIEPER. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7662

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

640 OCTAVIA, LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

GARCIA MONTOYA, JOSE

San Francisco, CA 94102

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

San Francisco, CA 94102

PIEPER, KARL HEINZ (AKA KALLE PIEPER)

San Francisco, CA 94102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREEDMAN, SCOTT

Attorney at ZACKS, FREEDMAN & PATTERSON, P.C.

235 Montgomery St., Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF 640 OCTAVIA, LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1121219F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COVER SHEET (NO RENT DUE) FILED BY PLAINTIFF 640 OCTAVIA, LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT PIEPER, KARL HEINZ (AKA KALLE PIEPER) GARCIA MONTOYA, JOSE DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 640 OCTAVIA, LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT PIEPER, KARL HEINZ (AKA KALLE PIEPER) GARCIA MONTOYA, JOSE DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7662
Case Title:640 OCTAVIA, LLC VS. KARL HEINZ PIEPER ET AL
Court Date:DEC-03-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Amended MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By 640 Octavia, Llc
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for December 3, 2021 line 6.PLAINTIFF 640 OCTAVIA, LLC'S AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTis continued to December 9, 2021 for opposing party to provide courtesy copies of opposition papers no later than December 3, 2021 with a cover letter reflecting new hearing date. =(501/REQ)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******7662
Case Title:640 OCTAVIA, LLC VS. KARL HEINZ PIEPER ET AL
Court Date:NOV-19-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /Summary Adjudication Of Issues
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for November 19, 2021 line 9.PLAINTIFF 640 OCTAVIA, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUESis OFF CALENDAR, re-noticed for December 3, 2021. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******7662
Case Title:640 OCTAVIA, LLC VS. KARL HEINZ PIEPER ET AL
Court Date:APR-08-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for April 8, 2021 line 8.DEFENDANT JOSE GARCIA MONTOYA, KALLE PIEPER MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISSDENIED. This action is filed as an unlimited jurisdiction unlawful detainer action seeking monetary (holdover damages) and nonmonetary (possession) remedies. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******7662
Case Title:640 OCTAVIA, LLC VS. KARL HEINZ PIEPER ET AL
Court Date:APR-02-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for April 2, 2021 line 10.DEFENDANTS JOSE GARCIA MONTOYA and KALLE PIEPER's MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISSis continued to April 8, 2021 for the moving party to provide courtesy copies of the moving papers. =(501/CFH)



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 640 Octavia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREEDMAN, SCOTT