This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 10:38:15 (UTC).

60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A VS. 60 RAUSCH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2012 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against 60 RAUSCH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9367

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS

Defendants

60 RAUSCH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MPM CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS MPM CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC.

RJ DRYWALL

IN & OUT PAINTING INC.

ROES 1-100

R.D. INSTALLATIONS, INC.

STAR ROODING COMPANY, INC.

COAST INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC.

MILTON PAINTING & DECORATING

DOES 1 TO 50

HAUSER, AN INDIVIDUAL, GEORGE

VINCE BORGES DBA APPLIED TECH PAINTING, LLC

JOHN F. MCLAUGHLIN WINDOW AND GLASS, INC.

RUSS WILL MECHANICAL, INC.

ICF ENTERPRISES, INC.

TJ MECHANICAL, INC.

Intervenors

NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK AS INTERVENOR AS THE INSURER OF T.J. MECHANICAL INC

ARROWOOD SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

PAGANO, WILLIAM F SPECIAL MASTER

Burlingame, CA 94010

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Intervenor and Plaintiff Attorneys

TAYLOR, PATRICK ELSWORTH

Attorney at BRADY, VORWERCK, RYDER & CASPINO

1855 Gateway Blvd, Ste 650

Concord, CA 94520

PRITCHARD, ROBERT W.

Attorney at LEE, HERNANDEZ, LANDRUM, GAROFALO & BLAKE

1670 Riviera Ave, #101

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KOPCZYNSKI, JAN A.

Attorney at RAM, OLSON, CEREGHINO & KOPCZYNSKI LLP

555 Montgomery St, Ste 820

San Francisco, CA 94111

MURPHY, JASON M.

Attorney at FARMER CASE HACK & FEDOR

101 Montgomery St, Ste 450

San Francisco, CA 94104

TURNER, GLENN E

Attorney at GIBBS, GIDEN, LOCHER & ACRET

2029 Century Park East, 34 Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3039

WELCH, STEPHEN BRENDAN

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BACON, JONATHAN CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St, Suite 800, Po Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BURNS, THOMAS JOSEPH

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS J. BURNS

5250 North Palm Avenue, Suite 201

Fresno, CA 93704

Other Attorneys

FREEDMAN, KARREN LEE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A BIARD

215 Lennon Lane, Ste 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

YEN, THOMAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BEVERLY E. NARAYAN

525 Market St Ste 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

BEATTY, THOMAS GEORGE

Attorney at MCNAMARA DODGE ET AL LLP

1211 Newell Avenue, Post Office Box 5288

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND (DEFENDANT-IN-INTERVENTION R.D. INSTALLATIONS, INC.) DEFAULT OF APR-04-2013 SET ASIDE

COMPLAINT

CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS AS TO DEFENDANT 60 RAUSCH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY THE BAUMEISTER COLLECTIVE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-22-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-21-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-07-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:960.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-31-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THE BAUMEISTER COLLECTIVE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER (COPY OF ORDER IN DEPT. 301 OUTBOX)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER ONE FILED BY THE SPECIAL MASTER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS SERVED OCT-02-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THE BAUMEISTER COLLECTIVE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER TWO

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER ONE; AND 2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TWO FILED BY OTHER PAGANO, WILLIAM F SPECIAL MASTER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY INTERVENOR ARROWOOD SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED JAN-08-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT CELL-CRETE CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY INTERVENOR ARROWOOD SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED MAY-29-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VALENZUELA ENGINEERING, INC

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE ON SECRETARY OF STATE FOR APPLIED TECH PAINTING, LLC, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY INTERVENOR ARROWOOD SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:60.00)

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF OF DEBRA A. STEVENS IN SUPPORT OF INTERVENOR ARROWOOD SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE CO.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY INTERVENOR ARROWOOD SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER THREE

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY INTERVENOR ARROWOOD SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT VINCE BORGES DBA APPLIED TECH PAINTING, LLC VALENZUELA ENGINEERING, INC

NOTICE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK AS INTERVENOR AS THE INSURER OF T.J. MECHANICAL INC

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order Dismissing Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING MAR-25-2014 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING MAR-25-2014 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-25-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS: PRITCHARD, ROBERT W. ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR 60 RAUSCH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY THE BAUMEISTER COLLECTIVE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-27-2014 - CASE SETTLED PER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 1/16/14. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON MAR-25-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK AS INTERVENOR AS THE INSURER OF T.J. MECHANICAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT VENTANA ALUMINUM MFG. CO (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY INTERVENOR ARROWOOD SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED MAY-29-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VALENZUELA ENGINEERING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT THE BAUMEISTER COLLECTIVE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 30.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • POS OF AMENDED SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT 60 RAUSCH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY THE BAUMEISTER COLLECTIVE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:1920.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS AS TO DEFENDANT 60 RAUSCH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY THE BAUMEISTER COLLECTIVE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50 HAUSER, AN INDIVIDUAL, GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-31-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THE BAUMEISTER COLLECTIVE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-31-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT 60 RAUSCH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 60 RAUSCH STREET HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OF ITS HOMEOWNERS MEMBERS AS TO DEFENDANT 60 RAUSCH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY THE BAUMEISTER COLLECTIVE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-22-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-21-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-07-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:960.00)

    Read MoreRead Less