This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 09:32:45 (UTC).

3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED VS. HILL & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2009 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HILL CO , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5075

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HILL & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HILL & COMPANY

ARROYO & COATES, INC.

ARROYO & COATS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

Cross Defendants

DEVAC OF CALIFORNIA

PLANT CONSTRUCTION, L.P.

MAGNOLIA PLACE VENTURE LLC

PEAK REALTY GROUP

DOES 51 TO 100

KEIGRAM, JAMES

FREAS PLASTERING COMPANY

Others

PEAK REALTY GROUP, INC.

KEIGHRAN, JIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY HOWARD

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

One California Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROECA, RUSSELL SAMUEL

Attorney at ROECA HAAS HAGER LLP

351 California St., Suite 900

San Francisco, CA 94104

MINIOZA, JOSEPH J.

Attorney at ERICKSON ARBUTHNOT

155 Grand Ave Ste 1050

Oakland, CA 94612

Other Attorney

PIA, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT PIA

855 Front Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT HILL & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ARROYO & COATS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-24-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-20-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-09-2009 (Fee:365.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED MAR-17-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL & COMPANY (Fee:365.00)

AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED MAR-17-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-31-2009 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) ARROYO & COATS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. THE JUL-24-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATES, INC. (Fee:365.00)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-01-2010 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 606. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-19-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-02-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-02-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-15-2010 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 505. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-13-2010 CONTINUED TO MAY-26-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE TO NOVEMBER 8, 2010

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-26-2010 CONTINUED TO AUG-25-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-25-2010 CONTINUED TO APR-13-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF HILL & COMPANY FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT HILL & COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT MAGNOLIA PLACE VENTURE LLC KEIGRAM, JAMES PEAK REALTY GROUP PLANT CONSTRUCTION, L.P. FREAS PLASTERING COMPANY DEVAC OF CALIFORNIA DOES 51 TO 100

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATES' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATES, INC.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2011
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-18-2011 VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-01-2011 - DISMISSAL ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND POS FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL & COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-13-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR - MEDIATED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DECLARATION OF CARLOS A ALVAREZ IN RESPONSE TO COURTS OSC RE: MEDIATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUN-29-2011 CONTINUED TO JUL-01-2011 AT 10:30 AM IN 505

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL & COMPANY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • FEE PAID ON STIP AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATES, INC. (Fee:385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED MAR-17-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, AS TO DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL & COMPANY (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED MAR-18-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HILL & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED MAR-17-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ARROYO & COATS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 3322 BUCHANAN STREET , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT HILL & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ARROYO & COATS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-24-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-20-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-09-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less