This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 03:47:04 (UTC).

300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP VS. GROUND SUPPORT PLLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2008 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GROUND SUPPORT PLLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1189

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

QUANTA INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C.

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C.

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C.

300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C.

ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C.

ZURICH NORTH AMERICA AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C.

AMERICAN REINSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC.

GROUND SUPPORT PLLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GROUND SUPPORT PLLC

ROES 1-20

ISI INSPECTION SERVICES INC.

ISI INSPECTION SERVICES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MALCOLM DRILLING COMPANY, INC. A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

ROES 1 TO 50

MALCOLM DRILLING COMPANY, INC

ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALPER, DEAN ANTHONY

Attorney at ALPER & MCCULLOCH

100 Drakes Landing Rd Ste 160

Greenbrae, CA 94904

HARNEY, GERARD

Attorney at COZEN & O'CONNOR

501 W Broadway Ste 1610

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GIACOMINI, ANDREW G

Attorney at HANSON BRIDGETT LLP

425 Market Street, 26 Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

LEARY, MEAGEN E

LAWSON, J. ANDREW

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

ERICKSEN, DAVID A

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON CTR

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111-0000

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAWSON, J. ANDREW

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

ERICKSEN, DAVID A

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON CTR

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111-0000

FINCH, SCOTT CAMPBELL

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWNA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

P. O. Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

RUSK, JAMES CRAIG

Attorney at OLES MORRISON RINKER & BAKER LLP

701 Pike St, Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98101

STAPLES, WILLIAM HACKING

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St. # 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-0000

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP AS TO DEFENDANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-27-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-22-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-12-2009 (Fee:335.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP SERVED OCT-30-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP SERVED NOV-04-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. ZURICH NORTH AMERICA AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. QUANTA INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. AMERICAN REINSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. AS TO DEFENDANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

COMPLAINT

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. QUANTA INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. AMERICAN REINSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. AS TO DEFENDANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

ORDER

ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-27-2009 CONTINUED TO MAY-15-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC (Fee:365.00*)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ROES 1-20

GENERAL DENIAL

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC. (Fee:365.00)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ISI INSPECTION SERVICES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION MALCOLM DRILLING COMPANY, INC. A CALIFORNIA COMPANY ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON X-COMPLAINT TO CROSS COMPLAINANT TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-15-2009 CONTINUED TO JUN-26-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT MALCOLM DRILLING COMPANY, INC (Fee:365.00)

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-10-2009 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, CROSS DEFENDANT(S) ISI INSPECTION SERVICES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. THE JUN-26-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC. FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ISI INSPECTION SERVICES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:365.00)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT ISI INSPECTION SERVICES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC MALCOLM DRILLING COMPANY, INC. A CALIFORNIA COMPANY ROES 1 TO 50

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-15-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-11-2010 - BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-30-2010 - BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JUN-15-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. MAY-26-2010 MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OR ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL DEAN A. ALPER AND CROSS-DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL DAVID A. ERICKSON FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM POLICIES AND PROCEDURES NO.4 (ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) IS ORDERED OFF CALENDAR AND DISSOLVED. REMOVED FROM ESP. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (212)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR FEB-18-2010 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR MAY-26-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM THE EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. QUANTA INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. AMERICAN REINSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. AS TO DEFENDANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • FIRST FILING FEE PAID BY 2 DEFTS TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC. AND GROUND SUPPORT PLLC FILED BY PLAINTIFF 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP (Fee:730.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. ZURICH NORTH AMERICA AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. QUANTA INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. AMERICAN REINSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEES OF 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE, L.L.C. AS TO DEFENDANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP SERVED NOV-04-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP SERVED OCT-30-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • CERTIFICATE OF MERIT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 300 SPEAR REALTY PARTNERS, LP AS TO DEFENDANT GROUND SUPPORT PLLC TREADWELL & ROLLO, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-27-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-22-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-12-2009 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUNICH REINSURANCE COMPANY FKA AMERICAN REINSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MALCOLM DRILLING COMPANY INC; DBA : MALCOLM DRILLING CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant