This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 08:31:03 (UTC).

2900 22ND STREET OWNERS' ASSOCIATION VS. SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2012 2900 22ND STREET OWNERS' ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8793

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants, Intervenors and Intervenor Defendants

2900 22ND STREET OWNERS' ASSOCIATION

NUEVA CASTILLA IRON WORKS, INC.

ROES 1-100

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MATRIX CONSTRUCTION

MINUTOLI, STEVE

GUCHO, MIGUEL DBA GUCHO PLUMBING

San Francisco, CA 94131

PACIFIC PLASTERING, INC.

SANTANA, MARINA

SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC

PACIFIC DOOR PRODUCTS INC

SANTANA, ESQUIVEL

MAVERICK CONSTRUCTION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC

SANTANA, ESQUIVEL

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Intervenors and Intervenor Defendants

MATRIX CONSTRUCTION

MINUTOLI, STEVE

ANDERSON, WOODY F

PACIFIC PLASTERING, INC.

CHRISTOPHER CLARK CONTRACTING

2900 22ND STREET OWNERS' ASSOCIATION

PIONEER CONTRACTORS, INC

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PACIFIC DOOR PRODUCTS INC

CLARK CONSTRUCTION

STEVE DUANE MEDDERS AND MICHAEL SHERIDAN JOSEPH DOING BUSINESS AS PARTNERSHIP PACIFIC PLASTERING

BEVERS III, JACK JORDAN

NUEVA CASTILLA IRON WORKS, INC.

OLD TOWN GLASS, INC

MAVERICK CONSTRUCTION

Other, Cross Defendant and Intervenor

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorney

FREDERICK, KEVIN DEAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN D. FREDERICK

605 Middlefield Road

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Intervenor and Other Attorneys

LUECK, ROBERT BERNARD

Attorney at BOORNAZIAN, JENSEN & GARTHE

555 12Th Street, Suite 1800

Oakland, CA 94607

O'BRIEN, JILLISA L.

Attorney at MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA LLP

2603 Main St. 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

MOLINARI, GINO JOSEPH

MORROW, WILLIAM D.

Attorney at MORROW & WHITE

535 Anton Boulevard, Ste. 1150

Costa Mesa, CA 926260000

GARCIA, ROBERT PAUL

Attorney at ROBERT P. GARCIA, ATTORNEY AT LAW

2588 Mission St.,#226

San Francisco, CA 94110

YEN, THOMAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BEVERLY E. NARAYAN

525 Market St Ste 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

BUTTRELL, LAURA K.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID A. WALLIS

2251 Harvard Street Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95815

FREDERICK, KEVIN DEAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN D. FREDERICK

605 Middlefield Road

Redwood City, CA 94063

BLAKE, ALBERT PORTER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY R. WAGNER

1655 Grant Street, Suite 800-B

Concord, CA 94520

HERP, PAUL A.

MCDONALD, STEVEN EDWARD

Attorney at BLEDSOE, CATHCART, DIESTAL, PEDERSEN & TREPPA LLP

601 California St 16Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94108

Cross Defendant and Intervenor Defendant Attorney

MCDONALD, STEVEN EDWARD

Attorney at BLEDSOE, CATHCART, DIESTAL, PEDERSEN & TREPPA LLP

601 California St 16Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA, ROBERT PAUL

Attorney at ROBERT P. GARCIA, ATTORNEY AT LAW

2588 Mission St.,#226

San Francisco, CA 94110

Other Attorneys

LUCAS, TIMOTHY D.

Attorney at THOMAS LUCAS

9191 Towne Centre Drive, Suite 190

San Diego, CA 92122

KESSEL, BART L

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

515 South Flower Street, Forty-Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

WAGER, JEROME ALLEN

PETERSON, PATRICIA J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. BIARD

215 Lennon Lane, Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

SCOTT, EDMUND MEAD

Attorney at GRAY DUFFY LLP

210 B Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood City, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND DEFAULT OF MAR-06-2013 SET ASIDE

Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment Against Cross-Complaint Jointly Filed by Santana Real Estate Development & Esquivel Santana

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST CROSS-COMPLAINT JOINTLY FILED BY SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ESQUIVEL SANTANA (TRANSACTION ID # 56084756) FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY HEARING SET FOR DEC-08-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:500.00)

Memo of Points & Authorities ISO Summary Judgment Against Cross-Complaint Jointly Filed by Santana Real Estate Development & Esquivel Santana

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST THE CROSS-COMPLAINT JOINTLY FILED BY SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC, AND ESQUIVEL SANTANA (TRANSACTION ID # 56084756) FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Separate Statement ISO Motion for Summary Judgment Against Cross-Complaint Jointly Filed by Santana Real Estate Development & Esquivel Santana

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 56084756) FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Declaration of J Chadic ISO Motion for Summary Judgment Against Cross-Complaint Jointly Filed by Santana Real Estate Development & Esquivel Santana

DECLARATION OF J CHADIC ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST CROSS-COMPLAINT JOINTLY FILED BY SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC & ESQUIVEL SANTANA (TRANSACTION ID # 56084756) FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Declaration of P Kim ISO Motion for Summary Judgment Against Cross-Complaint Jointly Filed by Santana Real Estate Development & Esquivel Santana

DECLARATION OF P KIM ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST CROSS-COMPLAINT JOINTLY FILED BY SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC & ESQUIVEL SANTANA (TRANSACTION ID # 56084756) FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Declaration of S Minutoli ISO Motion for Summary Judgment Against Cross-Complaint Jointly Filed by Santana Real Estate Development & Esquivel Santana

DECLARATION OF S MINUTOLI ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST CROSS-COMPLAINT JOINTLY FILED BY SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC & ESQUIVEL SANTANA (TRANSACTION ID # 56084756) FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion for Summary Judgment Against Cross-Complaint Jointly Filed by Santana Real Estate Development & Esquivel Santana

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56084756)

Proposed Order ISO Motion for Summary Judgment Against Cross-Complaint Jointly Filed by Santana Real Estate Development & Esquivel Santana

COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 56084756) FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:30.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT {JOINTLY} FILED BY DEFENDANT MATRIX CONSTRUCTION MINUTOLI, STEVE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 100,INCLUSIVE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF O'BRIEN, JILLISA L. ON FEB-10-2014 THROUGH FEB-14-2014 FILED BY INTERVENOR NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PIONEER CONTRACTORS, INC. IS A CORPORATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT THE THOMPSON CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 5 TO BE SANTANA, BENJAMIN DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 6 TO BE SANTANA, MARISELA DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 7 TO BE SANTANA, MARINA

Old Town Glass, Inc. Answer to Cross-Complaint of Benjamin Santana

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56390158) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT OLD TOWN GLASS, INC.

DECLARATION OF PAUL H. KIM IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING AND SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

DECLARATION OF PAUL H. KIM IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING AND SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56875273) FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING AND SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (HEARING DATE: 3/25/15 AT 9:30 A.M. IN DEPT. 302; MOVING PAPERS DUE 3/9/15; OPPOSITION DUE 3/19/15; NO REPLY)

Declaration of Laura Buttrell

DECLARATION OF LAURA BUTTRELL (TRANSACTION ID # 56887752) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PACIFIC DOOR PRODUCTS INC

303 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ALL PARTIES TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS & COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58489854)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-26-2016 CONTINUED TO APR-26-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58380975) FILED BY PLAINTIFF 2900 22ND STREET OWNERS' ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58269200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58198567) FILED BY INTERVENOR NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58185181)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT * SEE ATTACHMENT FOR NAMES OF PARTIES TO BE DISMISSES IN THE COMPLAINT. (TRANSACTION ID # 58116208) AS TO DEFENDANT MATRIX CONSTRUCTION MINUTOLI, STEVE PACIFIC PLASTERING IS A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN PIONEER CONTRACTORS, INC. IS A CORPORATION OLD TOWN GLASS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 58098366) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PACIFIC DOOR PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-27-2015 CONTINUED TO JAN-26-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. *** NOTE: TO ENFORCE A SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, PLEASE MAKE A MOTION IN DEPARTMENT 302. *** NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58060177) FILED BY PLAINTIFF 2900 22ND STREET OWNERS' ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
384 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT ESQUIVAL SANTANA'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT IS CONTINUED TO MAY 29, 2012 TO PROVIDE THE MOVING PARTY AN OPPORTUNITY TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 2.6B. THE MOVING PARTY MUST DELIVER COURTESY COPIES OF THE MOVING PAPERS AND ANY REPLY PAPERS TO DEPARTMENT 302 NO LATER THAN 4PM MAY 22 WITH A COVER LETTER STATING THE NEW HEARING DATE. IF THIS IS NOT DONE, THE MOTION WILL BE DENIED. THE COURT HAS COURTESY COPIES OF THE OPPOSITION PAPERS. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; COURT REPORTER: LAVENA WARD CSR #7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT ESQUIVAL SANTANA'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS CONTINUED TO MAY 29, 2012 TO PROVIDE THE MOVING PARTY AN OPPORTUNITY TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 2.6B. THE MOVING PARTY MUST DELIVER COURTESY COPIES OF THE MOVING PAPERS AND ANY REPLY PAPERS TO DEPARTMENT 302 NO LATER THAN 4PM MAY 22 WITH A COVER LETTER STATING THE NEW HEARING DATE. IF THIS IS NOT DONE, THE DEMURRER WILL BE OVERRULED. THE COURT HAS COURTESY COPIES OF THE OPPOSITION PAPERS. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; COURT REPORTER: LAVENA WARD CSR #7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLAINTIFF 2900 22ND STREET OWNERS' ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SANTANA, ESQUIVEL HEARING SET FOR MAY-21-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SANTANA, ESQUIVEL HEARING SET FOR MAY-21-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:960.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION OF GARCIA, ROBERT PAUL: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT FOR DEFENDANT SANTANA, ESQUIVEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 2900 22ND STREET OWNERS' ASSOCIATION SERVED MAR-13-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SANTANA, ESQUIVEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 2900 22ND STREET OWNERS' ASSOCIATION SERVED MAR-12-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 2900 22ND STREET OWNERS' ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT SANTANA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT, LLC SANTANA, ESQUIVEL MATRIX CONSTRUCTION MINUTOLI, STEVE DOES 1 TO 100,INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-08-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-04-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-24-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:960.00)

    Read MoreRead Less