This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 00:32:04 (UTC).

255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA VS. CHANNEL PARK DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2012 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CHANNEL PARK DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN K. STEWART, MARLA J. MILLER, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH and CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7395

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN K. STEWART

MARLA J. MILLER

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORAT

255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BROADWAY MECHANICAL-CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHANNEL PARK DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SIGNATURE PROPERTIES,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE RIDING GROUP II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 150, INCLUSIVE

DOES 1-125

DOES 127-150

KAWANEER COMPANY, INC.

KAWNEER COMPANY, INC.

ROES 1-500, INCLUSIVE

MOES 1-150

255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Other

HENNINGSEN, DAVE DH MEDIATION - SPECIAL MASTER

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MILLER, THOMAS E.

Attorney at THE MILLER LAW FIRM

235 Montgomery St, Ste 930

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GOODMAN, JOSHUA SETH

Attorney at GOODMAN NEUMAN HAMILTON LLP

417 Montgomery Street,, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

HERP, PAUL A.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BEVERLY E NARAYAN

525 Market St, Ste 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

HUGUENIN, EDWARD R.

Attorney at GREEN & HALL, APC

2999 Douglas Blvd., Ste. 220

Roseville, CA 956614216

WEITZEL, HARRY P.

Attorney at PEPPER HAMILTON LLP

4 Park Plaza, Ste 1200

Irvine, CA 92614

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLER, THOMAS E.

Attorney at THE MILLER LAW FIRM

235 Montgomery St, Ste 930

San Francisco, CA 94104

GOODMAN, JOSHUA SETH

Attorney at GOODMAN NEUMAN HAMILTON LLP

417 Montgomery Street,, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

HERP, PAUL A.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BEVERLY E NARAYAN

525 Market St, Ste 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

HUGUENIN, EDWARD R.

Attorney at GREEN & HALL, APC

2999 Douglas Blvd., Ste. 220

Roseville, CA 956614216

Other Attorney

HENNINGSEN, DAVID SEAN

Attorney at ROBINSON & WOOD, INC.

227 North First St. Ste. 100

San Jose, CA 95113

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHANNEL PARK DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY THE RIDING GROUP II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SIGNATURE PROPERTIES,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:1800.00)

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO APPOINT SPECIAL MASTER

ORDER

ORDER - PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 AND STIPULATION REGARDING PLEADINGS, MOTIONS, DISCOVERY, PRETRIAL AND SETTLEMENT MATTERS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Channel Park Development, LLC, et al.s Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54900977) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHANNEL PARK DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY THE RIDING GROUP II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SIGNATURE PROPERTIES,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS: GOODMAN, JOSHUA SETH ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR BROADWAY MECHANICAL-CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STIPULATED ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Notice of Entry of Order re: Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related Dates

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STIPULATED ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES (TRANSACTION ID # 55291812) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHANNEL PARK DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY THE RIDING GROUP II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SIGNATURE PROPERTIES,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Notice of Plaintiffs Further Inspections and Testing

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS FURTHER INSPECTIONS AND TESTING (TRANSACTION ID # 55299497) FILED BY PLAINTIFF 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CHANNEL PARK DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY THE RIDING GROUP II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SIGNATURE PROPERTIES,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Fee:450.00)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHANNEL PARK DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY THE RIDING GROUP II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SIGNATURE PROPERTIES,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 50.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 40.0 DAYS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADWAY MECHANICAL-CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDMENT TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SUBSTITUTING TRUE NAME FOR FICTITIOUS NAME

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56053718) AS TO DEFENDANT BROADWAY MECHANICAL-CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56323517)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBALANCE OF CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FEB-03-2015 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR FEB-03-2015 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Feb-04-2015 Dismissal MINI MINUTES: Notice having been given and there being no appearance nor an objection filed, the Court orders balance of case dismissed pursuant to California Rules of Court Section 3.1385. JUDGE JOHN K. STEWART; Clerk KCox; Proceedings not reported. (610); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: JOHN K. STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY KAWANEER COMPANY, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 56346569)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56323517)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Sep-08-2014 Case Settled - Set For Crc 3.1385 Hrg On Feb-03-15 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56053718) AS TO DEFENDANT BROADWAY MECHANICAL-CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-06-2014 - CASE SETTLED. NOTICE OF (CONDITIONAL) SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CAES FILED 8/21/14. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON FEB-03-2015 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR SEP-03-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT KAWNEER COMPANY, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR. A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF THE ENTIRE CASE WAS FILED ON AUGUST 21, 2014. JUDGE: ERNEST GOLDSMITH, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT, NOT REPORTED. =302/EG

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2013
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1500; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2113211F045

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION SERVED JAN-09-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION SERVED JAN-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CHANNEL PARK DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION SERVED JAN-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SIGNATURE PROPERTIES,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION SERVED JAN-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT BROADWAY MECHANICAL-CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION SERVED JAN-08-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT RE: SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA AND BROADWAY MECHANICAL-CONTRACTORS, INC. PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 411.35; DECLARATION OF THOMAS E. MILLER FILED BY PLAINTIFF 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1012C21F028

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 255 BERRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT CHANNEL PARK DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY THE RIDING GROUP II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SIGNATURE PROPERTIES,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BROADWAY MECHANICAL-CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 150, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-22-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-19-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-07-2013 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less