This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 16:23:46 (UTC).

1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION VS. 1960 SUTTER, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2009 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against 1960 SUTTER, LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6342

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED HEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION

NIBBI BROTHERS, INC.

GENERAL SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AN ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR GENERAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

NIBBI BROTHRS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THRU 200, INCL.

BOB AND TOM'S WINDOWS

Cross Defendants

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

HARDIE SIDING

TREX COMPANY

BOB & TOM'S

TREX COMPANY, INC.

PIONEER CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA COCPORATION

EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

VEZERIS, STEVE

VIC SOTTO, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GENERAL SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AN ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR GENERAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

U.S. GLASS & ALUMINUM, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

MARSH FENCE & DECK CO., A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

ZOES 1-25

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GILL, JOHN PHILIP

MILLER, THOMAS E.

Attorney at THE MILLER LAW FIRM

235 Montgomery St, Ste 930

San Francisco, CA 94104

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

MURPHY, JASON M.

Attorney at CAMBELL MURPHY

One Embarcadero Center,, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94111

HARRIS, CHARLES L

BOUZAGLOU-NEWCOMB, LYDIA R.

Attorney at LEWIS BRIBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 Town Center Dr Ste 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

MAYO, BRIGITTE M.

PETERSON, PETER KURT

Attorney at PETERSON MARTIN & REYNOLDS LLP

49 Stevenson Street, Tenth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

LIFTER, JILL JAYE

Attorney at RYAN & LIFTER

2010 Crow Canyon Place, Suite 330

San Ramon, CA 94583-1344

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HARRIS, CHARLES L

BOUZAGLOU-NEWCOMB, LYDIA R.

Attorney at LEWIS BRIBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 Town Center Dr Ste 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

MAYO, BRIGITTE M.

Other Attorneys

LOCKHART, ROBERT DOUGLAS

COGSHALL, WILLIAM L.

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 N. Main St., Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PARK, JULYN M

Attorney at LOCKHART PARK, LLP

1230 Oakmead Parkway, Ste 306

Sunnyvale, CA 94085

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND AND STIPULATION DEFAULT OF OCT-28-2011 SET ASIDE

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED HEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED APR-07-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT NIBBI BROTHRS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY 1960 SUTTER, LLC, NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, NIBBI BROTHERS, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT VEZERIS, STEVE

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY 1960 SUTTER, LLC, NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, NIBBI BROTHERS, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT BILCO, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY 1960 SUTTER, LLC, NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, NIBBI BROTHERS, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT FRIZELL, CHET

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION NIBBI BROTHERS, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-25-2011 CONTINUED TO MAY-13-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-27-2011 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO BRING 2ND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT AT ISSUE AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT(S) BOB & TOM'S. THE MAY-13-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR DESIGNATION OF NEW SPECIAL MASTER

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT BOB & TOM'S, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION NIBBI BROTHERS, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 30.0 DAYS

ORDER

ORDER RE AMENDED STIPULATION FOR DESIGNATION OF NEW SPECIAL MASTER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY MURPHY, JASON M.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING PLTF TO FLE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED HEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS (Fee:60.00)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 176 TO BE MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 177 TO BE BOB AND TOM'S WINDOWS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 178 TO BE GENERAL SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT GENERAL SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AN ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR GENERAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REMAINING CROSS-COMPLAINT(S) DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DEC-18-2012 AT 2:00 PM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-18-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY 1960 SUTTER, LLC, NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, NIBBI BROTHERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-22-2012. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AS TO ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 9/20/12. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON DEC-18-2012 AT 2:00 PM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT RICHARD AVELAR & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT GENERAL SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AN ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR GENERAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • OFF JURY CALENDAR A/C FAILURE TO DEPOSIT JURY FEES WITHIN PRESCRIBED TIME AS SET FORTH IN SEC. 631 CCP RESET FOR COURT TRIAL ON OCT-22-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED HEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 21.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION NIBBI BROTHRS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON STIPULATION APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION NIBBI BROTHERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION NIBBI BROTHERS, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC. BOB & TOM'S TREX COMPANY ARMCO MANAGEMENT TORRES, DAVID VEZERIS, STEVE FRIZELL, CHET BURGER, EUGENE EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION HARDIE SIDING DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE (Fee:2745.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED HEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED APR-22-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED HEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED APR-07-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT NIBBI BROTHRS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED HEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-26-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 1970 SUTTER STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF, AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED HEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS AS TO DEFENDANT 1960 SUTTER, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY NIBBI BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THRU 200, INCL. NIBBI BROTHRS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-18-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-06-2009 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:915.00)

    Read MoreRead Less