This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 23:54:47 (UTC).

140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION VS. CHARIOT SVN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2007 140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHARIOT SVN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5648

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BONELLI ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

E. MITCHELL,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WESTERN SHOWER DOOR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JENSEN LANDSCAPE & CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL INC.

RFJ, INC., DBA RFJ MEISWINKEL COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KONE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BENCHMARK BUILDERS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

R.J.S & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SPANGLER CONCRETE & ENGINEERING, INC.

THE SPRINCIN COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SPANGLER CONCRETE & ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HOUSE CONSTRUCTION

PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC., DBA ALCAL ROOFING & INSULATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KONE, INC.

TOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

UNITED CALIFORNIA GLASS

WESTERN SHOWER DOOR, INC.

RFJ, INC., DBA RFJ MEISWINKEL COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BENCHMARK BUILDERS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CEREGHINO, JEFFREY BRAILLARD

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

COMINOS, DION NICHOLAS

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, Ste 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

MAU, MICHAEL L.

Attorney at L/O MICHAEL L. MAU

950 Harrison St Ste 213

San Francisco, CA 94102-1087

OIUM, MARK EDWARD

Attorney at OIUM, REYEN & PRYOR

220 Montgomery St., Suite 910

San Francisco, CA 941040000

ZIMMERMAN, JON BRUCE

Attorney at ROBINSON&WOOD,INC.STE.#300

227 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

HENNINGSEN, DAVID SEAN

STROBEL, LLOYD J

345 Lorton Ave, Suite 303

Burlingame, CA 94010

SMITH, WALLACE ERIC

Attorney at CARROLL, BURDICK, & MCDONOUGH LLP

1676 N. California Blvd., Suite 620

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ANDERSON, WILLIAM DUNCAN

Attorney at PERRY, JOHNSON, ANDERSON, MILLER & MOSKOWITZ LLP

438 1St Street, 4Th Floor

Santa Rosa, CA 95401

MITTELMAN, MARK R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ZIMMERMAN, JON BRUCE

Attorney at ROBINSON&WOOD,INC.STE.#300

227 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

STROBEL, LLOYD J

345 Lorton Ave, Suite 303

Burlingame, CA 94010

Other Attorneys

REY-HIPOLITO, JACLYN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANTANA & HART

71 Stevenson Street, Ste 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

MAYFIELD, LORI R.

ORTLOFF, PAMELA A.

ENGLAND, ELIZABETH ANNE

Attorney at MORRIS POLICH & PURDY LLP

One Embarcadero Center, Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94111-3619

MYERS, GREGORY L.

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY L. MYERS

1500 W. Shaw Ave. Ste. 204

Fresno, CA 93711

MCINERNEY, WILLIAM HUGH

Attorney at MCINERNEY & DILLON, P.C.

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94612

BECKER, JENNIFER ANNE

Attorney at LONG & LEVIT LLP

465 California St. Ste. 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

YEE, DARRYL MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DARRYL M. YEE

22693 Hesperian Blvd., Ste 170

Hayward, CA 94541

DOPP, STEPHANIE M.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANTANA & HART

71 Stevenson St. Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

STONE, COLETTE F.

Attorney at STONE & ASSOCIATES

2125 Ygnacio Valley Road, Suite 101

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOV-21-2008 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 503. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR DEC-08-2008 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-13-2008 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION SERVED APR-22-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT BONELLI ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION SERVED APR-22-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT INTER TECHNOMICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT DANCO WATERPROFING CORPORATIN, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CHARIOT SVN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY BENCHMARK BUILDERS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ALLIED FIRE PROTECTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BONELLI ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CUPERTINO ELECTRIC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HOUSE CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION INTER TECHNOMICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION J.W. MCCLENAHAN CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION KONE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC., DBA ALCAL ROOFING & INSULATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION PACIFIC STAIR CO., AN OREGON CORPORATION POWERS ELECTRIC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RFJ, INC., DBA RFJ MEISWINKEL COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION R.J.S & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SPANGLER CONCRETE & ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WESTERN SHOWER DOOR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ALPHA FIRE PROTECTION,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION COOPER & JACKSON, INC. DBA OLYMPIA RESTORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION E. MITCHELL,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION THE SPRINCIN COMANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZEBRA AWNING CO., INC. JENSEN LANDSCAPE & CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MOES 1 TO 100

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HOUSE CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SPANGLER CONCRETE & ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND (OF DEFENDANT E.

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND (OF DEFENDANT E. MITCHELL, INC.) DEFAULT OF JUN-24-2010 SET ASIDE

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DANCO WATERPROOFING CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BENCHMARK BUILDERS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:410.00)

ORDER GRANTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION AND FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT

SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE JOHN E. MUNTER FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAR-03-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 305. MAR-28-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICES SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION GRANTING BENCHMARK BUILDERS, INC. LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

CROSS COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BENCHMARK BUILDERS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CHARIOT SVN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ZOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT DANCO WATERPROOFING CORPORATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEBRA AWNING CO., INC.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (WITH FEE)

(JOINDER) TO MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT J.W. MCCLENAHAN CO. (Fee:40.00)

MINUTES FOR DEC-22-2011 11:00 AM

MINUTES FOR DEC-22-2011 11:00 AM FOR DEPT 305

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF 140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

188 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-26-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR; DISMISSALS FILED. JUDGE: JOHN E. MUNTER; CLERK: CRAIG BLACKSTONE; NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY BENCHMARK BUILDERS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (TRANSACTION ID # 53219469)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 53165722)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-26-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-26-2013 AT 3:00 PM IN DEPT. 305 UPON STIPULATION OF COUNSEL. NOTICE WAIVED. JUDGE: JOHN E. MUNTER; CLERK: CRAIG BLACKSTONE; NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-07-2013 CONTINUED TO JUN-26-2013 AT 3:00 PM IN DEPT. 305 UPON STIPULATION OF COUNSEL. NOTICE WAIVED. JUDGE: JOHN E. MUNTER; CLERK: CRAIG BLACKSTONE; NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED ON APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 51748917) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 51716248)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-02-2013 CONTINUED TO MAY-07-2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 305 BY REQUEST OF PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 50441187) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BRENT F. BASILICO IN SUPPORT OF APPL FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 50441187) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
311 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2008
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-28-2007 CONTINUED TO FEB-08-2008 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHARIOT SVN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON NOV-20-2007 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR NOV-20-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) TO PLAINTIFF 140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT CHARIOT SVN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY THE SPRINCIN COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 140 SOUTH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT CHARIOT SVN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-28-2007 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-01-2007 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-13-2007 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SPANGLER CONCRETE & ENGINEERING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Coast Building Products Inc ind and as successor in interest to Alcal Specialty Contracting Inc et al is a litigant

Latest cases where KONE INC. is a litigant