This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 09:31:27 (UTC).

Zurich American Insurance Company vs State Farm General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Zurich American Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm General Insurance Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zurich American Insurance Company

Defendant

State Farm General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Morales, Ramiro

2151 Salvio Street Suite 280

Concord, CA 94520

NEAR, LAURENCE

2151 Salvio Street Suite 280

Concord, CA 94520

Defendant Attorney

Blanchard, Christopher J

3200 Inland Empire Blvd Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Summons

Original Summons filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Refers to: State Farm General Insurance Company

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Refers to: State Farm General Insurance Company

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by State Farm General Insurance Company.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.

Request for Judicial Notice (Requests)

Request for Judicial Notice (5/20/2022) filed by State Farm General Insurance Company.

Demurrer (Motions)

Demurrer (5/20/2022) filed by State Farm General Insurance Company.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements) (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION) filed by State Farm General Insurance Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by State Farm General Insurance Company. Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Filed By: Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer (5/20/2022) filed by State Farm General Insurance Company. Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (5/20/2022) filed by State Farm General Insurance Company. Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION) filed by State Farm General Insurance Company. Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Refers to: State Farm General Insurance Company Filed By: Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Refers to: State Farm General Insurance Company Filed By: Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Filed By: Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Filed By: Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bowman, Blaine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEAR, LAURENCE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORALES, RAMIRO