This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 08:07:28 (UTC).

Zhou vs Sun

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Zhou filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sun. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zhou, Limei

Defendants

Massage Oasis Spa Inc

Sun, Derek

Sun, Shirley

Tranquility Solutions

Yu, Xiao

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Liu, Long Z

Attorney at LIU LAW INC

1163 Fairway Dr Unit 105

City Of Industry, CA 91748

Defendant Attorney

PLEASANT, JOSEPH M

8550 Balboa Boulevard 290

Northridge, CA 91325

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Sun, Shirley; Sun, Derek; Yu, Xiao; Massage Oasis Spa Inc; Tranquility Solutions

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Sun, Shirley; Sun, Derek; Yu, Xiao; Massage Oasis Spa Inc; Tranquility Solutions

Complaint

Complaint filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Sun, Shirley; Sun, Derek; Yu, Xiao; Massage Oasis Spa Inc; Tranquility Solutions

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Massage Oasis Spa Inc

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Tranquility Solutions

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Sun, Derek

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Sun, Shirley

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Zhou, Limei.

Demurrer (Motions)

Demurrer filed by Yu, Xiao; Sun, Derek; Massage Oasis Spa Inc.

Motion to Strike (Motions)

Motion to Strike filed by Sun, Shirley; Yu, Xiao; Sun, Derek; Massage Oasis Spa Inc; Tranquility Solutions.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike filed by Sun, Shirley; Yu, Xiao; Sun, Derek; Massage Oasis Spa Inc; Tranquility Solutions.; Filed By: Sun, Shirley (Defendant); Yu, Xiao (Defendant); Sun, Derek (Defendant); Massage Oasis Spa Inc (Defendant); Tranquility Solutions (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer filed by Yu, Xiao; Sun, Derek; Massage Oasis Spa Inc.; Filed By: Yu, Xiao (Defendant); Sun, Derek (Defendant); Massage Oasis Spa Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Zhou, Limei.; Filed By: Zhou, Limei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Massage Oasis Spa Inc; Filed By: Zhou, Limei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Tranquility Solutions; Filed By: Zhou, Limei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Sun, Derek; Filed By: Zhou, Limei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Sun, Shirley; Filed By: Zhou, Limei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/19/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Sun, Shirley; Sun, Derek; Yu, Xiao; Massage Oasis Spa Inc; Tranquility Solutions; Filed By: Zhou, Limei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Sun, Shirley; Sun, Derek; Yu, Xiao; Massage Oasis Spa Inc; Tranquility Solutions; Filed By: Zhou, Limei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Zhou, Limei. Refers to: Sun, Shirley; Sun, Derek; Yu, Xiao; Massage Oasis Spa Inc; Tranquility Solutions; Filed By: Zhou, Limei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIU LONG Z.