This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/08/2022 at 05:32:00 (UTC).

Zamora Coelho vs Ryan

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Zamora Coelho filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ryan. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo

Defendant

Ryan, Rebecca ; ESA : Ryan, Rebecca Elizabeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Buck, Tyler J

Attorney at BUCK LAW APC

845 15Th St #103

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Gonzalez, Jorge C

Attorney at GONZALEZ & GARCIA APC

715 3Rd Ave

Chula Vista, CA 91910

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo. Refers to: Ryan, Rebecca

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo. Refers to: Ryan, Rebecca

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo. Refers to: Ryan, Rebecca

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo. Refers to: Ryan, Rebecca

Answer

Answer filed by Ryan, Rebecca.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Ryan, Rebecca.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Ryan, Rebecca.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ryan, Rebecca.; Filed By: Ryan, Rebecca (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Ryan, Rebecca.; Filed By: Ryan, Rebecca (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ryan, Rebecca.; Filed By: Ryan, Rebecca (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo. Refers to: Ryan, Rebecca; Filed By: Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo. Refers to: Ryan, Rebecca; Filed By: Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo. Refers to: Ryan, Rebecca; Filed By: Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo. Refers to: Ryan, Rebecca; Filed By: Zamora Coelho, Daniel Arturo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ JORGE CARLOS