This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 02:10:38 (UTC).

Zaki vs Darnell & Associates

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Zaki filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Darnell Associates. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zaki, Ahmad

ABZ Inc

Zairey Inc

Defendants

Darnell & Associates

Darnell, Bill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hotchkiss, Sam W

Attorney at HOTCHKISS & HUR APLC

Defendant Attorney

DeSantis, Kevin V

Attorney at DUNN DESANTIS WALT & KENDRICK LLP

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by ABZ Inc; Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ABZ Inc; Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Darnell, Bill; Darnell & Associates.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Darnell, Bill; Darnell & Associates.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/04/2021 09:15:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by ABZ Inc; Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ABZ Inc; Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc.

Defendants' Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Darnell, Bill; Darnell & Associates.

Answer of Darnell, et al.

Answer filed by Darnell, Bill; Darnell & Associates.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Darnell, Bill; Darnell & Associates.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ABZ Inc; Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ABZ Inc; Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by ABZ Inc; Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc; ABZ Inc. Refers to: Darnell & Associates; Darnell, Bill

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc; ABZ Inc. Refers to: Darnell & Associates; Darnell, Bill

Certificate of Merit

Certificate of Merit filed by Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc; ABZ Inc. Refers to: Darnell & Associates; Darnell, Bill

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 05/13/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 09:00AM before Judge Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/04/2021 09:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by ABZ Inc; Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc. Filed By: ABZ Inc (Plaintiff); Zaki, Ahmad (Plaintiff); Zairey Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by ABZ Inc; Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc. Filed By: ABZ Inc (Plaintiff); Zaki, Ahmad (Plaintiff); Zairey Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Darnell, Bill; Darnell & Associates. Filed By: Darnell, Bill (Defendant); Darnell & Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/04/2021 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc; ABZ Inc. Refers to: Darnell & Associates; Darnell, Bill Filed By: Zaki, Ahmad (Plaintiff); Zairey Inc (Plaintiff); ABZ Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc; ABZ Inc. Refers to: Darnell & Associates; Darnell, Bill Filed By: Zaki, Ahmad (Plaintiff); Zairey Inc (Plaintiff); ABZ Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Merit filed by Zaki, Ahmad; Zairey Inc; ABZ Inc. Refers to: Darnell & Associates; Darnell, Bill Filed By: Zaki, Ahmad (Plaintiff); Zairey Inc (Plaintiff); ABZ Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABZ Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Darnell & Associates is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hotchkiss, Sam W