This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/24/2018 at 12:56:20 (UTC).

Zachary Schroeder vs. Mazie LaForest

Case Summary

On 05/19/2017 Zachary Schroeder filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mazie LaForest. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHROEDER, ZACHARY

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant

LAFOREST, MAZIE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 09/18/2017 08:00:00 AM.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Declaration of Non Military Status (Small Claims)

Declaration of Non Military Status (Small Claims) filed by Schroeder, Zachary.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest sub

[Another document for ROA# 14]

Notice to Filing Party SD

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest submitted by Schroeder, Zachary rejected on 03/07/2018.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie

Satisfaction of Judgment - full

Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Schroeder, Zachary.

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie Filed By: Schroeder, Zachary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie Filed By: Schroeder, Zachary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest submitted by Schroeder, Zachary rejected on 03/07/2018. Filed By: Schroeder, Zachary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 14]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie Filed By: Schroeder, Zachary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non Military Status (Small Claims) filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Filed By: Schroeder, Zachary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 09/18/2017 08:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • The Court finds judgment on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court for Zachary Schroeder and against Mazie LaForest in the amount of: $350.00 principal, $40.00 costs, $0 pre-judgment interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie Filed By: Schroeder, Zachary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 09/18/2017 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-22 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Department C-22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Declaration - Other filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie Filed By: Schroeder, Zachary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Schroeder, Zachary. Refers to: LaForest, Mazie Filed By: Schroeder, Zachary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.