This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 08:12:59 (UTC).

Yousefi vs US Bank National Assoc

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 Yousefi filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against US Bank National Assoc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yousefi, Atefeh

Defendant

US Bank National Assoc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE, LARRY W

Attorney at DIVERSITY LAW GROUP PC

515 S Figueroa St Suite 1250

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Campbell, Jason S.

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

333 S Grand Avenue 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Fife, Joan B. Tucker

101 California Street 35Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Yousefi, Atefeh. Refers to: US Bank National Assoc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yousefi, Atefeh. Refers to: US Bank National Assoc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Yousefi, Atefeh. Refers to: US Bank National Assoc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Yousefi, Atefeh. Refers to: US Bank National Assoc

Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court

Notice - Other (NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL) filed by US Bank National Assoc.

Notice to the Clerk of the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by US Bank National Assoc.

Answer

Answer filed by US Bank National Assoc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by US Bank National Assoc. Filed By: US Bank National Assoc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL) filed by US Bank National Assoc. Filed By: US Bank National Assoc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by US Bank National Assoc. Filed By: US Bank National Assoc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Yousefi, Atefeh. Refers to: US Bank National Assoc Filed By: Yousefi, Atefeh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Yousefi, Atefeh. Refers to: US Bank National Assoc Filed By: Yousefi, Atefeh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yousefi, Atefeh. Refers to: US Bank National Assoc Filed By: Yousefi, Atefeh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Yousefi, Atefeh. Refers to: US Bank National Assoc Filed By: Yousefi, Atefeh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less