This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 15:52:33 (UTC).

Youngblood vs GB Auto Service Inc

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 Youngblood filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GB Auto Service Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Youngblood, Leon

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GB Auto Service Inc

3242 Columbia LLC

S A White Associates LLC

S A Whitehouse Associates LLC

SA Whitehouse Associates LLC

San Diego Rescue Mission Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lujan, Norma Jessica

Lynn, Samuel G.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Fodrini, Jason Michael

Daftary, David Mohammad

De La Cerda, Micaela W

PERRI, KENNETH s

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Received on 6/1/23 -Not Entered) filed by GB Auto Service Inc.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by GB Auto Service Inc.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Youngblood, Leon.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Cause of Actions (Cross Complaint) filed by 3242 Columbia LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by 3242 Columbia LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/03/2023 10:30:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (SA Whitehouse Associates LLC) filed by Youngblood, Leon. Refers to: SA Whitehouse Associates LLC

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by 3242 Columbia LLC.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by 3242 Columbia LLC. Refers to: GB Auto Service Inc

Answer

Answer filed by 3242 Columbia LLC.

Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Youngblood, Leon.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by GB Auto Service Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Youngblood, Leon.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Youngblood, Leon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/20/2023 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by GB Auto Service Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by GB Auto Service Inc.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Youngblood, Leon.

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Received on 6/1/23 -Not Entered) filed by GB Auto Service Inc.; Filed By: GB Auto Service Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by GB Auto Service Inc.; Filed By: GB Auto Service Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/09/2024 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2024 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Cause of Actions (Cross Complaint) filed by 3242 Columbia LLC.; Filed By: 3242 Columbia LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to GB Auto Service Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to 3242 Columbia LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to GB Auto Service Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to GB Auto Service Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to S A Whitehouse Associates LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (ADDITIONAL- DENIED) filed by Youngblood, Leon.; Filed By: Youngblood, Leon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Youngblood, Leon.; Filed By: Youngblood, Leon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Youngblood, Leon.; Filed By: Youngblood, Leon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees filed by Youngblood, Leon.; Filed By: Youngblood, Leon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Youngblood, Leon. Refers to: GB Auto Service Inc; S A Whitehouse Associates LLC; San Diego Rescue Mission Inc; SA Whitehouse Associates LLC; S A White Associates LLC; 3242 Columbia LLC; Filed By: Youngblood, Leon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less