This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/29/2023 at 08:13:22 (UTC).

Young vs Barker Chiropractic

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 Young filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Barker Chiropractic. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Young, Nancy

Defendants

Barker Chiropractic

Mayer DC, Maura

Wilkes DC, Sarah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Williams, Matthew T

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Young, Nancy. Refers to: Wilkes DC, Sarah; Barker Chiropractic; Mayer DC, Maura

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Young, Nancy; Wilkes DC, Sarah; Barker Chiropractic. Refers to: Mayer DC, Maura

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Young, Nancy; Wilkes DC, Sarah; Barker Chiropractic. Refers to: Mayer DC, Maura

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Young, Nancy; Wilkes DC, Sarah; Barker Chiropractic. Refers to: Mayer DC, Maura

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed by Young, Nancy.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Young, Nancy.

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2023

HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Young, Nancy.; Filed By: Young, Nancy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed by Young, Nancy.; Filed By: Young, Nancy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketCase reassigned from Judge Katz, Keri to Kenneth Medel effective 10/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Young, Nancy; Wilkes DC, Sarah; Barker Chiropractic. Refers to: Mayer DC, Maura; Filed By: Young, Nancy (Plaintiff); Wilkes DC, Sarah (Plaintiff); Barker Chiropractic (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022

DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Young, Nancy; Wilkes DC, Sarah; Barker Chiropractic. Refers to: Mayer DC, Maura; Filed By: Young, Nancy (Plaintiff); Wilkes DC, Sarah (Plaintiff); Barker Chiropractic (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Young, Nancy; Wilkes DC, Sarah; Barker Chiropractic. Refers to: Mayer DC, Maura; Filed By: Young, Nancy (Plaintiff); Wilkes DC, Sarah (Plaintiff); Barker Chiropractic (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Young, Nancy; Wilkes DC, Sarah; Barker Chiropractic. Refers to: Mayer DC, Maura; Filed By: Young, Nancy (Plaintiff); Wilkes DC, Sarah (Plaintiff); Barker Chiropractic (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Young, Nancy. Refers to: Wilkes DC, Sarah; Barker Chiropractic; Mayer DC, Maura; Filed By: Young, Nancy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less