This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 16:21:35 (UTC).

York vs. Smiths Medical ASD Inc

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 York filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Smiths Medical ASD Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YORK, BRADLEY

Defendant

SMITHS MEDICAL ASD INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARABEE, JOEL D

Defendant Attorney

PARTI, VANI

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by York, Bradley. Refers to: Smiths Medical ASD Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by York, Bradley. Refers to: Smiths Medical ASD Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by York, Bradley. Refers to: Smiths Medical ASD Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Notice of Removal to Federal Court) filed by Smiths Medical ASD Inc.

Notice to State Court And All Adverse Parties of Removal

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Smiths Medical ASD Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Answer) filed by Smiths Medical ASD Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Smiths Medical ASD Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Notice of Removal to Federal Court) filed by Smiths Medical ASD Inc. Filed By: Smiths Medical ASD Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Smiths Medical ASD Inc. Filed By: Smiths Medical ASD Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Answer) filed by Smiths Medical ASD Inc. Filed By: Smiths Medical ASD Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Smiths Medical ASD Inc. Filed By: Smiths Medical ASD Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by York, Bradley. Refers to: Smiths Medical ASD Inc Filed By: York, Bradley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by York, Bradley. Refers to: Smiths Medical ASD Inc Filed By: York, Bradley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by York, Bradley. Refers to: Smiths Medical ASD Inc Filed By: York, Bradley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less