This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 23:18:21 (UTC).

Yongbin Im vs Tahira Abbasi

Case Summary

On 06/26/2014 Yongbin Im filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Tahira Abbasi. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH F. HAYES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH F. HAYES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Im, Sunghee

Im, Yongbin

ABT Medical Supply Inc

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ABBASI, TAHIRA

Compton, Susan

Nasar, Aboo

VALLES, JULIE ; AKA : SADLER, JULIE

ARDENT HOSPICE & PALLIATIVE CARE INC

ARDENT GROUP INC

ARDENT HOSPICE & PALLIATIVE CARE OF FRESNO INC

ARDENT HOSPICE OF THE DESERT INC

COMPTON, M SUSAN

ABT Medical Supply Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

OH, J JOHN

625 The City Dr S

Orange, CA 92868

DAMIANI, LISA J

Attorney at DAMIANI LAW GROUP

1059 Tenth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LIEB, JACK R

Attorney at LIEB & LIEB

4950 Waring Rd #11

San Diego, CA 92120

CHAUDHRY, VIC

CLOGSTON, MADELINE M

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DAMIANI, LISA J

Attorney at DAMIANI LAW GROUP

1059 Tenth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

LIEB, JACK R

Attorney at LIEB & LIEB

4950 Waring Rd #11

San Diego, CA 92120

CHAUDHRY, VIC

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order Extending First and Second Expert Witness Exchange Dates

Order - Other (Extending First and Second Expert Witness Exchange Dates) filed by ABT Medical Supply Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by ABT Medical Supply Inc.

Answer to Complaint By ABT Medical Supply, Inc.

Answer filed by ABT Medical Supply Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Nasar, Aboo.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Im, Yongbin; Im, Sunghee. Refers to: ABBASI, TAHIRA; Nasar, Aboo; Compton, Susan; ABT Medical Supply Inc

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing filed by Compton, Susan.

Stipulation and Order to Consolidate

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation and Order to Consolidate) filed by Nasar, Aboo; ABBASI, TAHIRA; Im, Yongbin; Im, Sunghee; Compton, Susan; Valles, Julie; ABT Medical Supply Inc; Ardent Group Inc; Ardent Hospice & Palliative Care Inc; Ardent Hospice & Palliative Care of Fresno Inc;OTHERS.

Answer

Answer filed by Compton, Susan. Refers to: Nasar, Aboo; ABBASI, TAHIRA

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by Im, Sunghee; Im, Yongbin.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Stipulation - Other (Stipulation for Judgment) submitted by Nasar, Aboo rejected on 04/13/2017.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Compton, Susan.

Notice of Rescheduled Case Managment Conference

Notice - Other (of Rescheduled Case Managment Conference) filed by Nasar, Aboo; ABBASI, TAHIRA.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Im, Yongbin; Im, Sunghee. Refers to: ABBASI, TAHIRA; Nasar, Aboo; Compton, Susan; ABT Medical Supply Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/12/2015 10:00:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (as to cross-complaint) filed by Compton, Susan.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service (Susan Compton) filed by Im, Yongbin. Refers to: ABBASI, TAHIRA

Answer

Answer filed by Nasar, Aboo; ABBASI, TAHIRA.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ABT Medical Supply Inc.

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to ABT Medical Supply Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ardent Hospice of the Desert Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ardent Hospice & Palliative Care of Fresno Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ardent Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Compton, M Susan .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ardent Hospice & Palliative Care Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Valles, Julie .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Im, Sunghee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Im, Yongbin .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to ABBASI, TAHIRA .

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Im, Yongbin. Refers to: Nasar, Aboo Filed By: Im, Yongbin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non-Service (Tahira Abbasi) filed by Im, Yongbin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (ABT Medical Supply Inc) filed by Im, Yongbin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/13/2015 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Hayes, Judith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Im, Yongbin; Im, Sunghee. Refers to: ABBASI, TAHIRA; Nasar, Aboo; Compton, Susan; ABT Medical Supply Inc Filed By: Im, Yongbin (Plaintiff); Im, Sunghee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Im, Yongbin; Im, Sunghee. Refers to: ABBASI, TAHIRA; Nasar, Aboo; Compton, Susan; ABT Medical Supply Inc Filed By: Im, Yongbin (Plaintiff); Im, Sunghee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Im, Yongbin; Im, Sunghee. Refers to: ABBASI, TAHIRA; Nasar, Aboo; Compton, Susan; ABT Medical Supply Inc Filed By: Im, Yongbin (Plaintiff); Im, Sunghee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.