This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 03:32:28 (UTC).

Yessian VS Trans Union LLC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Yessian filed an Other lawsuit against Trans Union LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yessian, Rosa

Yessian, Jonathan

Defendant

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Swigart, Joshua B

Defendant Attorney

Marker, Kristin L.

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yessian, Jonathan; Yessian, Rosa.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Yessian, Jonathan; Yessian, Rosa.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Yessian, Jonathan; Yessian, Rosa. Refers to: Trans Union LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Trans Union LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/13/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Trans Union LLC. Filed By: Trans Union LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Yessian, Jonathan; Yessian, Rosa. Refers to: Trans Union LLC Filed By: Yessian, Jonathan (Plaintiff); Yessian, Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yessian, Jonathan; Yessian, Rosa. Filed By: Yessian, Jonathan (Plaintiff); Yessian, Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Yessian, Jonathan; Yessian, Rosa. Filed By: Yessian, Jonathan (Plaintiff); Yessian, Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/13/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.