This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/14/2018 at 20:56:51 (UTC).

YESENIA ANGUIANO vs. VIRGINIA LIZARRAGA

Case Summary

On 01/24/2011 YESENIA ANGUIANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VIRGINIA LIZARRAGA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

RAMIREZ, CLAUDIA

ANGUIANO, YESENIA

Defendants

OROZCO, JAIME

LIZARRAGA, VIRGINIA

OROZCO, DINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

PARMAN, MARY AM

575 Anton Blvd

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

ALGORRI, MARK STEVEN

Attorney at DEWITT ALGORRI & ALGORRI

25 E Union St

Pasadena, CA 91103

Defendant Attorney

ELLIOTT, KELLY R

Attorney at DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

9325 Sky Park Court Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

Notice of Dismissal SD

Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/09/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by ANGUIANO, YESENIA rejected on 11/01/2011.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/09/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/17/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Voided Filing SD

Answer voided on 05/06/2011. Refers to: ANGUIANO, YESENIA; RAMIREZ, CLAUDIA

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by LIZARRAGA, VIRGINIA, on 04/22/2011, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by ANGUIANO, YESENIA rejected on 11/01/2011. Filed By: ANGUIANO, YESENIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Notice of Unconditional Settlement (Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) filed by ANGUIANO, YESENIA. Refers to: LIZARRAGA, VIRGINIA; OROZCO, JAIME Filed By: ANGUIANO, YESENIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/17/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/17/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/09/2011 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/09/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2011
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by LIZARRAGA, VIRGINIA. Filed By: LIZARRAGA, VIRGINIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • Certificate of Service filed by ANGUIANO, YESENIA. Refers to: LIZARRAGA, VIRGINIA; OROZCO, JAIME; OROZCO, DINA Filed By: ANGUIANO, YESENIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • Certificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (Extension to file Certificate of Service granted up to 4/25/11 (30 days)) filed by ANGUIANO, YESENIA. Refers to: LIZARRAGA, VIRGINIA; OROZCO, JAIME; OROZCO, DINA Filed By: ANGUIANO, YESENIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Claudia Ramirez) filed by ANGUIANO, YESENIA. Refers to: RAMIREZ, CLAUDIA Filed By: ANGUIANO, YESENIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • Application for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Claudia Ramirez) filed by ANGUIANO, YESENIA. Refers to: RAMIREZ, CLAUDIA Filed By: ANGUIANO, YESENIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by ANGUIANO, YESENIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • Complaint filed by ANGUIANO, YESENIA.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.