This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 03:15:25 (UTC).

Yerzy vs Bedley

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 Yerzy filed an Other lawsuit against Bedley. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Yerzy, Tina

Respondent

Bedley, Maxwell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Martin, Justin M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Cancelled Service) filed by Yerzy, Tina. Refers to: Bedley, Maxwell Filed By: Yerzy, Tina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketThe ex parte dismissal request was granted .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse set for 6/29/21 at 09:00am vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/16/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Yerzy, Tina. Filed By: Yerzy, Tina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 06/16/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-61 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention) filed by Yerzy, Tina. Refers to: Bedley, Maxwell Filed By: Yerzy, Tina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yerzy, Tina. Refers to: Bedley, Maxwell Filed By: Yerzy, Tina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Yerzy, Tina. Filed By: Yerzy, Tina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Yerzy, Tina. Filed By: Yerzy, Tina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse scheduled for 06/29/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Justin M