This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 04:05:45 (UTC).

YERINGTON VS CHANDLER

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 YERINGTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHANDLER. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YERINGTON, LISA

Defendants

CHANDLER, LIZETH LOPEZ; AKA : LOPEZ, LIZETH A;DBA : PURE CLEANING AGENCY

CHANDLER, SEAN ; DBA : PURE CLEANING AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDSMAN, PHILIP

5776 Lindero Canyon Road Suite D666

Westlake Village, CA 91362

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by YERINGTON, LISA. Refers to: CHANDLER, SEAN; CHANDLER, LIZETH

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by YERINGTON, LISA. Refers to: CHANDLER, SEAN; CHANDLER, LIZETH

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by YERINGTON, LISA. Refers to: CHANDLER, SEAN; CHANDLER, LIZETH

Notice - Other (Notices)

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by YERINGTON, LISA.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement filed by YERINGTON, LISA. Filed By: YERINGTON, LISA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by YERINGTON, LISA. Refers to: CHANDLER, SEAN; CHANDLER, LIZETH Filed By: YERINGTON, LISA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by YERINGTON, LISA. Refers to: CHANDLER, SEAN; CHANDLER, LIZETH Filed By: YERINGTON, LISA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by YERINGTON, LISA. Refers to: CHANDLER, SEAN; CHANDLER, LIZETH Filed By: YERINGTON, LISA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDSMAN PHILIP LAW OFFICES OF