This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 02:13:27 (UTC).

YEO VS FAY SERVICING LLC

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 YEO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FAY SERVICING LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald F. Frazier and Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ronald F. Frazier

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yeo, Annie

Defendants

All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title or any cloud on plaintiffs title herein

CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Entra Default Solutions LLC

Fay Servicing LLC

CIVIC HOLDINGS III TRUST

HMC Assets LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cate, Allan

Attorney at CATE LEGAL GROUP

888 Prospect Street Village Of La Jolla, Suite 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorney

Valenzuela, Amelia

2015 Manhattan Beach Boulevard 111

Redondo Beach, CA 90278

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Entra Default Solutions, LLC of Non-Monetary Status as to Plaintiff's Complaint

Declaration - Other filed by Entra Default Solutions LLC.

Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Demurrer filed by CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Fay Servicing LLC; HMC Assets LLC.

Request for Judicial Notice in support of Defendants' Demurrer

Request for Judicial Notice filed by CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Fay Servicing LLC; HMC Assets LLC.

Declaration of Amelia Valenzuela regarding Meet and Confer

Declaration - Other (of Amelia B. Valenzuela) filed by CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Fay Servicing LLC; HMC Assets LLC.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for an order to show cause and temporary restraining order) filed by Yeo, Annie.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Annie Yeo) filed by Yeo, Annie.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Yeo, Annie received but not filed on 08/11/2021.

Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order

Opposition - Other (to ex parte application) filed by CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Entra Default Solutions LLC; Fay Servicing LLC; HMC Assets LLC.

Request for Judicial Notice in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order

Request for Judicial Notice filed by CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Entra Default Solutions LLC; Fay Servicing LLC; HMC Assets LLC.

Declaration of Stasia M. Bailey in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order

Declaration - Other (of Stasia M. Bailey) filed by CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Entra Default Solutions LLC; Fay Servicing LLC; HMC Assets LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/12/2021 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/16/2021 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Bacal, Katherine to Ronald Frazier effective 07/30/2021

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

Declaration of Prejudice CCP 170.6

Peremptory Challenge filed by Yeo, Annie.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Yeo, Annie. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Entra Default Solutions LLC; CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title or any cloud on plaintiffs title herein

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yeo, Annie. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Entra Default Solutions LLC; CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title or any cloud on plaintiffs title herein

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Yeo, Annie. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Entra Default Solutions LLC; CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title or any cloud on plaintiffs title herein

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer filed by CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Fay Servicing LLC; HMC Assets LLC. Filed By: CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC (Defendant); Fay Servicing LLC (Defendant); HMC Assets LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice filed by CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Fay Servicing LLC; HMC Assets LLC. Filed By: CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC (Defendant); Fay Servicing LLC (Defendant); HMC Assets LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Amelia B. Valenzuela) filed by CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Fay Servicing LLC; HMC Assets LLC. Filed By: CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC (Defendant); Fay Servicing LLC (Defendant); HMC Assets LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Entra Default Solutions LLC. Filed By: Entra Default Solutions LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/16/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEx Parte continued pursuant to Court's motion to 08/16/2021 at 08:30AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/12/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Bacal, Katherine to Ronald Frazier effective 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Yeo, Annie. Filed By: Yeo, Annie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Yeo, Annie. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Entra Default Solutions LLC; CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title or any cloud on plaintiffs title herein; HMC Assets LLC; CIVIC HOLDINGS III TRUST Filed By: Yeo, Annie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yeo, Annie. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Entra Default Solutions LLC; CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title or any cloud on plaintiffs title herein Filed By: Yeo, Annie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Yeo, Annie. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Entra Default Solutions LLC; CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiffs title or any cloud on plaintiffs title herein Filed By: Yeo, Annie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Civic Holdings III Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTRA DEFAULT SOLUTIONS LLC A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HMC Assets LLC solely and in its capacity as separate Trustee of Ccommunity Development I Trust is a litigant