This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/10/2022 at 07:16:05 (UTC).

YAZBECK vs PEATROSS

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 YAZBECK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PEATROSS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Nupeutics Natural, Inc.

Yazbeck., Daniel

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PEATROSS, JESSICA L.

Moon, Jason

Peatross, M.D., Jessica

Sundos, Munzer M

DRJESS.COM LLC

Cross Defendants

MYDX INC

Ayoub, George

Nupeutics Natural, Inc.

Sundos, Munzer M

Yazbeck., Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

KIRBY, JASON M

Webb, Lenden F

Attorney at WEBB LAW GROUP APC

10509 Vista Sorrento Parkway 450

San Diego, CA 92121

Booth, Kellsi

5792 W Jefferson Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90016

Hall, David P

5050 Avenida Encinas #300

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

Weller, Charles C

Attorney at CHARLES C WELLER APC

11412 Corley Ct

San Diego, CA 92126

KIRBY, JASON M

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Weller, Charles C

Attorney at CHARLES C WELLER APC

11412 Corley Ct

San Diego, CA 92126

Mahoney, Matthew M

Attorney at WITHAM MAHONEY & ABBOTT LLP

401 B Street 2220

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion for Leave to Amend

Motion for Leave to Amend (3/6/2020) filed by Yazbeck, Daniel.

Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint

Statement - Other filed by Peatross, Jessica L..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Peatross, Jessica L..

Ex Parte Application and Order

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (2/27) filed by Yazbeck, Daniel.

Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and related Deadlines; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

Notice - Other (2/27) filed by Yazbeck, Daniel.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (2/27) filed by Yazbeck, Daniel.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF NEW TRIAL AND RELATED DATES/DEADLINES) filed by Yazbeck, Daniel.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/27/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/06/2020 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 05/07/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 04/09/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Stipulation - Other (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Cases for All Purposes) submitted by Peatross, Jessica L. rejected on 06/02/2020.

Substitution of Attorney - Daniel Yazbeck

Substitution of Attorney filed by Yazbeck, Daniel.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 69]

Substitution of Attorney - Daniel Yazbeck

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due submitted by Peatross, Jessica L. rejected on 06/29/2020.

176 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil) - Motion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition - Other filed by Sundos, Munzer M; Nupeutics Natural, Inc.. Filed By: Sundos, Munzer M (Defendant); Nupeutics Natural, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Sundos, Munzer M; Nupeutics Natural, Inc.. Filed By: Sundos, Munzer M (Defendant); Nupeutics Natural, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Sundos, Munzer M; Nupeutics Natural, Inc.. Filed By: Sundos, Munzer M (Defendant); Nupeutics Natural, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Sundos, Munzer M; Nupeutics Natural, Inc.. Filed By: Sundos, Munzer M (Defendant); Nupeutics Natural, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - Other (2/10) filed by Yazbeck., Daniel. Filed By: Yazbeck., Daniel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (2/10) filed by Yazbeck., Daniel. Filed By: Yazbeck., Daniel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
241 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (11/28 EX PARTE) filed by Yazbeck, Daniel. Filed By: Yazbeck., Daniel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (11/28 EX PARTE) filed by Yazbeck, Daniel. Filed By: Yazbeck., Daniel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 11/28/2018 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Yazbeck, Daniel. Refers to: Peatross, Jessica Filed By: Yazbeck., Daniel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yazbeck, Daniel. Refers to: Peatross, Jessica Filed By: Yazbeck., Daniel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Yazbeck, Daniel. Refers to: Peatross, Jessica Filed By: Yazbeck., Daniel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MYDX INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRBY, JASON M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEBB LENDEN