This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 06:26:41 (UTC).

Yang vs Legoland California LLC

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Yang filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Legoland California LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yang, Yueher

Defendants

Legoland California LLC

Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.

Legoland California Resort LLC; ESA : Legoland California LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Strassburg, Justin K

Attorney at STRASSBURG GILMORE & WEI LLP

1250 E Walnut Street 136

Pasadena, CA 91106

Defendant Attorney

Lewis, Rosemarie Suazo

626 Wilshire Suite 975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/25/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Yang, Yueher. Refers to: Legoland California LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets) (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yang, Yueher. Refers to: Legoland California LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.

Complaint (Case Initiation)

[A document for ROA# 1]

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Yang, Yueher.

Answer

Answer filed by Legoland California Resort LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc..

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Legoland California Resort LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.. Filed By: Legoland California Resort LLC (Defendant); Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Yang, Yueher. Filed By: Yang, Yueher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/25/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Yang, Yueher. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc. Filed By: Yang, Yueher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yang, Yueher. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc. Filed By: Yang, Yueher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Yang, Yueher. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc. Filed By: Yang, Yueher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT is a litigant

Latest cases where Merlin Entertainments Group US Holding Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Legoland California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRASSBURG JUSTIN K.