This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 09:29:43 (UTC).

Yancy vs GPI CA-SV Inc

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Yancy filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GPI CA-SV Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yancy, Patricia

Defendant

Group 1 Automotive Inc; ESA : GPI CA-SV Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Otkupman, Roman

5743 Corsa Ave 123

Westlake Village, CA 91362

Defendant Attorney

Jacobs, Mark J

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

2050 Main Street 1000

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Yancy, Patricia. Refers to: GPI CA-SV Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yancy, Patricia. Refers to: GPI CA-SV Inc

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Yancy, Patricia. Refers to: GPI CA-SV Inc

Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's PAGA Complaint

Answer filed by Group 1 Automotive Inc.

Joint Stipulation to Continue Defendant's Responsive Pleading Deadline and [Proposed] Order

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Continue Defendants Responsive Pleading Deadline and Order) filed by Group 1 Automotive Inc; Yancy, Patricia.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Group 1 Automotive Inc. Filed By: Group 1 Automotive Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Continue Defendants Responsive Pleading Deadline and Order) filed by Group 1 Automotive Inc; Yancy, Patricia. Filed By: Group 1 Automotive Inc (Defendant); Yancy, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Yancy, Patricia. Refers to: Group 1 Automotive Inc Filed By: Yancy, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Yancy, Patricia. Refers to: Group 1 Automotive Inc Filed By: Yancy, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yancy, Patricia. Refers to: Group 1 Automotive Inc Filed By: Yancy, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Yancy, Patricia. Refers to: Group 1 Automotive Inc Filed By: Yancy, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Group 1 Automotive, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS MARK JARROD