This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/19/2022 at 06:01:36 (UTC).

Xu vs The Irvine Company LLC [200600410048]

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 Xu filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against The Irvine Company LLC 200600410048. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Xu, Hongwei

San Diego, CA 92122

Yu, Luowen

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant

The Irvine Company LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice to Filing Party SD

[A document for ROA# 9]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Xu, Hongwei; Yu, Luowen. Refers to: The Irvine Company LLC [200600410048]

Request - Other

Request - Other (Request for Certified Mail) submitted by Xu, Hongwei; Yu, Luowen rejected on 07/21/2022. Refers to: The Irvine Company LLC [200600410048]

Application and Order Correcting Court Record

Application and Order Correcting Court Record filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court (First Amended) filed by Xu, Hongwei; Yu, Luowen. Refers to: The Irvine Company LLC

Request - Other

Request - Other (Certified Mail) filed by Xu, Hongwei; Yu, Luowen. Refers to: The Irvine Company LLC

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-63; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCertified Mail Green Card Tracking Numbers filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Other (Certified Mail) filed by Xu, Hongwei; Yu, Luowen. Refers to: The Irvine Company LLC; Filed By: Xu, Hongwei (Plaintiff); Yu, Luowen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court (First Amended) filed by Xu, Hongwei; Yu, Luowen. Refers to: The Irvine Company LLC; Filed By: Xu, Hongwei (Plaintiff); Yu, Luowen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Other (Request for Certified Mail) submitted by Xu, Hongwei; Yu, Luowen rejected on 07/21/2022. Refers to: The Irvine Company LLC [200600410048]; Filed By: Xu, Hongwei (Plaintiff); Yu, Luowen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 9]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 10/10/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Xu, Hongwei; Yu, Luowen. Refers to: The Irvine Company LLC [200600410048]; Filed By: Xu, Hongwei (Plaintiff); Yu, Luowen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant